Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Horse Racing (C6)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0180 /CH0227 (SB0182)
Title
Video Lottery Terminal Revenues - Purse Dedication Account - Standardbred Racetrack Operating Loss Assistance
Sponsor
Delegate Turner
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1176
Title
Video Lottery Terminal Revenues - Standardbred Owners and Trainers - Benefit Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Knotts
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0182 (HB0180/CH0227)
Title
Video Lottery Terminal Revenues - Purse Dedication Account - Standardbred Racetrack Operating Assistance
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0929 /CH0213
Title
Video Lottery Terminal Revenues - Standardbred Owners and Trainers - Benefit Programs
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0180 /CH0227 (SB0182) Video Lottery Terminal Revenues - Purse Dedication Account - Standardbred Racetrack Operating Loss Assistance Delegate Turner 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 227
Ways and Means
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2015 - 2:00 PM
HB1176 Video Lottery Terminal Revenues - Standardbred Owners and Trainers - Benefit Programs Delegate Knotts 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Ways and Means
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2015 - 2:00 PM
SB0182 (HB0180/CH0227) Video Lottery Terminal Revenues - Purse Dedication Account - Standardbred Racetrack Operating Assistance Senator King 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0929 /CH0213 Video Lottery Terminal Revenues - Standardbred Owners and Trainers - Benefit Programs Senator King 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 213
Budget and Taxation
3/18/2015 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM