Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Horse Racing (C6)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0481 (SB0578)
Title
State Racing Commission - Equine Medical Director - Employment and Costs
Sponsor
Delegate Turner
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0606 (SB0178/CH0500)
Title
Horse Racing - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Eligibility and Capital Expenditures
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0662
Title
Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Fair Hill
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0895 (SB0655)
Title
Horse Racing - Prizes - Intercepts for Restitution and Child Support Payments
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0178 /CH0500 (HB0606)
Title
Horse Racing - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Eligibility and Capital Expenditures
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0578 (HB0481)
Title
State Racing Commission - Equine Medical Director - Employment and Costs
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0655 (HB0895)
Title
Horse Racing - Prizes - Intercepts for Restitution and Child Support Payments
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0481 (SB0578) State Racing Commission - Equine Medical Director - Employment and Costs Delegate Turner 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB0606 (SB0178/CH0500) Horse Racing - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Eligibility and Capital Expenditures Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Ways and Means
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0662 Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Fair Hill Cecil County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB0895 (SB0655) Horse Racing - Prizes - Intercepts for Restitution and Child Support Payments Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0178 /CH0500 (HB0606) Horse Racing - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Eligibility and Capital Expenditures Senator Peters 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 500
Finance
2/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0578 (HB0481) State Racing Commission - Equine Medical Director - Employment and Costs Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0655 (HB0895) Horse Racing - Prizes - Intercepts for Restitution and Child Support Payments Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM