Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Campaign Financing

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0070
Title
Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0418 (SB0691)
Title
Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0562
Title
Election Law - Use of Campaign Funds for Meeting and Conference Expenses
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0569
Title
Campaign Finance - Cash Contributions - Limit
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0619
Title
Election Law - Campaign Contributions Made by Public Service Companies - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Simmons
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0827 /CH0103
Title
Municipal Elections - Campaign Finance Reports - Submission of Copies to the State Board of Elections
Sponsor
Delegate Summers
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0942
Title
State Government - Use of Public Resources - Reimbursement by Elected State Officials
Sponsor
Delegate McDonough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1269
Title
Maryland Small Donor Incentive Act
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1401
Title
Election Law - Fair Campaign Financing Fund - Income Tax Checkoff
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0007 (SJ0006)
Title
United States Constitutional Convention - Democracy Amendment
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0691 (HB0418)
Title
Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0809
Title
Citizens' United Shareholder Democracy and Protection Act
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0930 /CH0074
Title
Election Law - Filing Deadlines for Pre-Primary Election and Post-General Election Campaign Finance Reports
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1043
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance Entities - Inactive Status
Sponsor
Senator Getty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0006 (HJ0007)
Title
United States Constitutional Convention - Democracy Amendment
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0070 Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB0418 (SB0691) Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 2:15 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/06/2014 - 2:15 PM
HB0562 Election Law - Use of Campaign Funds for Meeting and Conference Expenses Delegate Howard 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0569 Campaign Finance - Cash Contributions - Limit Delegate Howard 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0619 Election Law - Campaign Contributions Made by Public Service Companies - Prohibition Delegate Simmons 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0827 /CH0103 Municipal Elections - Campaign Finance Reports - Submission of Copies to the State Board of Elections Delegate Summers 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 103
Ways and Means
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0942 State Government - Use of Public Resources - Reimbursement by Elected State Officials Delegate McDonough 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1269 Maryland Small Donor Incentive Act Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1401 Election Law - Fair Campaign Financing Fund - Income Tax Checkoff Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
HJ0007 (SJ0006) United States Constitutional Convention - Democracy Amendment Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0691 (HB0418) Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0809 Citizens' United Shareholder Democracy and Protection Act Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0930 /CH0074 Election Law - Filing Deadlines for Pre-Primary Election and Post-General Election Campaign Finance Reports Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 74
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1043 Election Law - Campaign Finance Entities - Inactive Status Senator Getty 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
SJ0006 (HJ0007) United States Constitutional Convention - Democracy Amendment Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM