Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Camps

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0364 /CH0107
Title
Swimming Pools - Automated External Defibrillator Programs (Connor's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Hucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0365 /CH0616
Title
Harford County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0411 (SB0301)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Harford County - Maryland STEM Lab at Broad Creek Memorial Scout Reservation
Sponsor
Delegate DeBoy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0918 (SB0437)
Title
Health - Youth Camps - Definitions
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1075 (SB0657)
Title
Criminal Law - Third Degree Sexual Offense - Person in Position of Authority
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1358 (SB0663)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Camp Woodlands Teepee Project
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1372 /CH0430 (SB0934)
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1482 /CH0601 (SB1031/CH0600)
Title
Hunting - Domesticated Animals - Prohibited Acts
Sponsor
Delegate Cane
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0301 (HB0411)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Harford County - Maryland STEM Lab at Broad Creek Memorial Scout Reservation
Sponsor
Senator Glassman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0437 (HB0918)
Title
Health - Youth Camps - Definitions
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0657 (HB1075)
Title
Criminal Law - Third Degree Sexual Offense - Person in Position of Authority
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0663 (HB1358)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Camp Woodlands Teepee Project
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0934 (HB1372/CH0430)
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator DeGrange
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1031 /CH0600 (HB1482/CH0601)
Title
Hunting - Domesticated Animals - Prohibited Acts
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0364 /CH0107 Swimming Pools - Automated External Defibrillator Programs (Connor's Law) Delegate Hucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 107
Health and Government Operations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0365 /CH0616 Harford County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone Delegate Glass 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 616
Environmental Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0411 (SB0301) Creation of a State Debt - Harford County - Maryland STEM Lab at Broad Creek Memorial Scout Reservation Delegate DeBoy 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/11/2013 - 10:00 AM
HB0918 (SB0437) Health - Youth Camps - Definitions Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1075 (SB0657) Criminal Law - Third Degree Sexual Offense - Person in Position of Authority Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1358 (SB0663) Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Camp Woodlands Teepee Project Delegate Love 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/09/2013 - 12:00 PM
HB1372 /CH0430 (SB0934) Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations Delegate Jones 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 430
Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1482 /CH0601 (SB1031/CH0600) Hunting - Domesticated Animals - Prohibited Acts Delegate Cane 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 601
Environmental Matters
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0301 (HB0411) Creation of a State Debt - Harford County - Maryland STEM Lab at Broad Creek Memorial Scout Reservation Senator Glassman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2013 - 11:00 AM
SB0437 (HB0918) Health - Youth Camps - Definitions Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0657 (HB1075) Criminal Law - Third Degree Sexual Offense - Person in Position of Authority Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0663 (HB1358) Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Camp Woodlands Teepee Project Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 10:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2013 - 10:00 AM
SB0934 (HB1372/CH0430) Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations Senator DeGrange 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB1031 /CH0600 (HB1482/CH0601) Hunting - Domesticated Animals - Prohibited Acts Senator Colburn 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 600
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM