Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Capital Budgets

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0101 /CH0014 (SB0126)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2019, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2009, 2011, 2012, 2013, 2014, 2015, 2016, 2017, and 2018
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0136 (SB0314)
Title
Department of General Services - Energy-Conserving and Bird-Safe Building Standards (Maryland Sustainable Buildings Act of 2019)
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0155 /CH0385 (SB0164/CH0386)
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Capital and Grant Programs - State Grants
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0178 /CH0217 (SB0177/CH0218)
Title
Maryland Stadium Authority - Ocean City Convention Facility - Renovation
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0332 /CH0540 (SB0158)
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Community Dental Clinics Grant Program
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0931 (SB0940/CH0474)
Title
Health Care Facilities - Certificate of Need - Modifications
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0990 (SB0883)
Title
Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Use of Funds
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1266 /CH0732 (SB0754)
Title
National Capital Strategic Economic Development Program - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1347 /CH0737
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt – Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1427 /CH0442
Title
Sea Level Rise Inundation and Coastal Flooding - Construction, Adaptation, and Mitigation
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0012 /CH0083
Title
Capital Projects - Inclusion of Public Art
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0126 (HB0101/CH0014)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2019, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2009, 2011, 2012, 2013, 2014, 2015, 2016, 2017, and 2018
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0158 (HB0332/CH0540)
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Community Dental Clinics Grant Program
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0164 /CH0386 (HB0155/CH0385)
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Capital and Grant Programs - State Grants
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0177 /CH0218 (HB0178/CH0217)
Title
Maryland Stadium Authority - Ocean City Convention Facility - Renovation
Sponsor
Minority Leader
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0754 (HB1266/CH0732)
Title
National Capital Strategic Economic Development Program - Established
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0883 (HB0990)
Title
Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Use of Funds
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0940 /CH0474 (HB0931)
Title
Health Care Facilities - Certificate of Need - Modifications
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0101 /CH0014 (SB0126) Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2019, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2009, 2011, 2012, 2013, 2014, 2015, 2016, 2017, and 2018 Speaker 3 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 14
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
HB0136 (SB0314) Department of General Services - Energy-Conserving and Bird-Safe Building Standards (Maryland Sustainable Buildings Act of 2019) Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed (93-40)
Health and Government Operations
2/05/2019 - 2:00 PM
Appropriations
HB0155 /CH0385 (SB0164/CH0386) Maryland Department of Health - Capital and Grant Programs - State Grants Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 385
Appropriations
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0178 /CH0217 (SB0177/CH0218) Maryland Stadium Authority - Ocean City Convention Facility - Renovation Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 217
Appropriations
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0332 /CH0540 (SB0158) Maryland Department of Health - Community Dental Clinics Grant Program Delegate McKay 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 540
Health and Government Operations
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Budget and Taxation
HB0931 (SB0940/CH0474) Health Care Facilities - Certificate of Need - Modifications Delegate Kipke 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0990 (SB0883) Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Use of Funds Delegate Chang 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/01/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1266 /CH0732 (SB0754) National Capital Strategic Economic Development Program - Established Delegate Washington 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 732
Appropriations
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Budget and Taxation
HB1347 /CH0737 Prior Authorizations of State Debt – Alterations Delegate Jones 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 737
Appropriations
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2019 - 12:45 PM
HB1427 /CH0442 Sea Level Rise Inundation and Coastal Flooding - Construction, Adaptation, and Mitigation Delegate Stein 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 442
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0012 /CH0083 Capital Projects - Inclusion of Public Art Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 83
Finance
1/23/2019 - 2:00 PM
Appropriations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0126 (HB0101/CH0014) Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2019, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2009, 2011, 2012, 2013, 2014, 2015, 2016, 2017, and 2018 President 3 2 In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
SB0158 (HB0332/CH0540) Maryland Department of Health - Community Dental Clinics Grant Program Senator Guzzone 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Finance
2/06/2019 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0164 /CH0386 (HB0155/CH0385) Maryland Department of Health - Capital and Grant Programs - State Grants President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 386
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Appropriations
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0177 /CH0218 (HB0178/CH0217) Maryland Stadium Authority - Ocean City Convention Facility - Renovation Minority Leader 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 218
Budget and Taxation
2/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0754 (HB1266/CH0732) National Capital Strategic Economic Development Program - Established Senator Peters 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Appropriations and Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Appropriations
Environment and Transportation
SB0883 (HB0990) Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Use of Funds Senator Beidle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0940 /CH0474 (HB0931) Health Care Facilities - Certificate of Need - Modifications Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 474
Finance
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:19 PM