Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Census -see also- Data; Demographics

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0356 (SB0307)
Title
General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment Commission
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0537
Title
Potomac Compact for Fair Representation
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0988 (SB0855/CH0018)
Title
2020 Census Grant Program - Establishment and Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Gaines
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0307 (HB0356)
Title
General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment Commission
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0855 /CH0018 (HB0988)
Title
2020 Census Grant Program - Establishment and Funding
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0356 (SB0307) General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment Commission Speaker 3 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/26/2018 - 3:00 PM
HB0537 Potomac Compact for Fair Representation Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/26/2018 - 3:00 PM
HB0988 (SB0855/CH0018) 2020 Census Grant Program - Establishment and Funding Delegate Gaines 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0307 (HB0356) General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment Commission President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0855 /CH0018 (HB0988) 2020 Census Grant Program - Establishment and Funding Senator Guzzone 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 18
Budget and Taxation
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/23/2018 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM