Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Chartered Counties

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0169
Title
Health Insurance - Rollback of Federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act Conforming Provisions
Sponsor
Delegate Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1205 /CH0645 (SB0993)
Title
Frederick County - Transition to Charter Government - Corrections to References in the Annotated Code of Maryland
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1415 /CH0261 (SB1017)
Title
Chief Executive Officer or County Executive - Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in Office
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0993 (HB1205/CH0645)
Title
Frederick County - Transition to Charter Government - Corrections to References in the Annotated Code of Maryland
Sponsor
Senator Brinkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1017 (HB1415/CH0261)
Title
Chief Executive Officer or County Executive - Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in Office
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0169 Health Insurance - Rollback of Federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act Conforming Provisions Delegate Hough 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2014 - 12:30 PM
HB1205 /CH0645 (SB0993) Frederick County - Transition to Charter Government - Corrections to References in the Annotated Code of Maryland Frederick County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 645
Environmental Matters
3/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1415 /CH0261 (SB1017) Chief Executive Officer or County Executive - Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in Office Delegate Kaiser 2 2 Assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 261
Ways and Means
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0993 (HB1205/CH0645) Frederick County - Transition to Charter Government - Corrections to References in the Annotated Code of Maryland Senator Brinkley 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1017 (HB1415/CH0261) Chief Executive Officer or County Executive - Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in Office Senator Raskin 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM