Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Chartered Counties

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0260 (SB0780)
Title
Local Government - Sexual Assault Cases - Local Audits
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0317
Title
Labor and Employment - Wages and Benefits - Preemption of Local Authority
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0434 (SB0062)
Title
Real Property - Backyard Gardens - Prohibition on Restrictions
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1370
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Rights for Local Government Employees - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1592 (SB0931)
Title
Local Jurisdictions - Zoning Authority - Generating Stations
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0062 (HB0434)
Title
Real Property - Backyard Gardens - Prohibition on Restrictions
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0532
Title
Temporary Family Health Care Structures - Permits
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0780 (HB0260)
Title
Local Government - Sexual Assault Cases - Local Audits
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0931 (HB1592)
Title
Public Service Commission - Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity - Consistency With Comprehensive Plan
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0260 (SB0780) Local Government - Sexual Assault Cases - Local Audits Delegate Queen 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Appropriations
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0317 Labor and Employment - Wages and Benefits - Preemption of Local Authority Delegate Davis 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0434 (SB0062) Real Property - Backyard Gardens - Prohibition on Restrictions Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1370 Labor and Employment - Employment Rights for Local Government Employees - Establishment Delegate Young, P. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1592 (SB0931) Local Jurisdictions - Zoning Authority - Generating Stations Delegate Jameson 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0062 (HB0434) Real Property - Backyard Gardens - Prohibition on Restrictions Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0532 Temporary Family Health Care Structures - Permits Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0780 (HB0260) Local Government - Sexual Assault Cases - Local Audits Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0931 (HB1592) Public Service Commission - Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity - Consistency With Comprehensive Plan Senator Astle 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM