Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Checks

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0242 (SB0206)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking (True Freedom Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0459
Title
Criminal Law - Victims of Human Trafficking - Affirmative Defense
Sponsor
Delegate Cain
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0543 (SB0151)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Closed Estates - Subsequent Discovery of Check
Sponsor
Delegate Bhandari
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0839 (SB0539)
Title
Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1196 (SB0939)
Title
Financial Institutions - Check Cashing Services - Registration and Dissemination of Information
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1430
Title
Video Lottery Operator - Reconciliation of Proceeds - Uncollectible Debt
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1499
Title
Education - Public High Schools - Financial Literacy Curriculum
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0151 (HB0543)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Closed Estates - Subsequent Discovery of Check
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0206 (HB0242)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking (True Freedom Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0539 (HB0839)
Title
Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0939 (HB1196)
Title
Financial Institutions - Check Cashing Services - Registration and Dissemination of Information
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0242 (SB0206) Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking (True Freedom Act of 2020) Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
1/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0459 Criminal Law - Victims of Human Trafficking - Affirmative Defense Delegate Cain 2 2 In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0543 (SB0151) Estates and Trusts - Closed Estates - Subsequent Discovery of Check Delegate Bhandari 2 2 In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0839 (SB0539) Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/24/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1196 (SB0939) Financial Institutions - Check Cashing Services - Registration and Dissemination of Information Delegate Washington 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1430 Video Lottery Operator - Reconciliation of Proceeds - Uncollectible Debt Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1499 Education - Public High Schools - Financial Literacy Curriculum Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0151 (HB0543) Estates and Trusts - Closed Estates - Subsequent Discovery of Check Senator West 2 2 In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0206 (HB0242) Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking (True Freedom Act of 2020) Senator Lee 2 2 In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0539 (HB0839) Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0939 (HB1196) Financial Institutions - Check Cashing Services - Registration and Dissemination of Information Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 2/21/2020 5:13 PM