Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Chemical Tests

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0150
Title
Vehicle Laws - Accidents Resulting in Death or Life-Threatening Injury - Mandatory Drug and Alcohol Testing (Kara's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0255 /CH0093
Title
Allegany County - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0303 /CH0365
Title
Task Force to Study Point-of-Care Testing for Lead Poisoning
Sponsor
Delegate Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0346 /CH0031 (SB0216/CH0030)
Title
Harford County - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0351 /CH0101
Title
State Athletic Commission - Amateur Mixed Martial Arts and Amateur Kick Boxing - Licensing and Regulation
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0627 (SB0850)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Accidents Resulting in Injury - Mandatory Drug and Alcohol Testing
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0754
Title
Environment - Reduction of Lead Risk in Housing - Qualified Offer
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0834
Title
Human Services - Public Assistance - Mandatory Drug Tests
Sponsor
Delegate Stocksdale
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0987
Title
Punitive Damages - High-Risk Drunk Drivers
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1067
Title
Environment - Reduction of Lead Risk in Housing - Blood Lead Level
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1100
Title
Maryland Compassionate Care Act
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1475 (SB1070)
Title
Baltimore County - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights
Sponsor
Baltimore County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1490
Title
Drunk and Drugged Driving - Refusal to Take a Blood or Breath Test - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0114
Title
Health - Pregnant Women - Hepatitis B Testing
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0178
Title
Family Law - Blood or Genetic Test Results - Legal Finding of Paternity
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0216 /CH0030 (HB0346/CH0031)
Title
Harford County - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights
Sponsor
Senator Glassman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0850 (HB0627)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Accidents Resulting in Injury - Mandatory Drug and Alcohol Testing
Sponsor
Senator Forehand
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0959 (HB0765)
Title
Drugged Driving - Drug Recognition Expert - Testimony
Sponsor
Senator Getty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0989
Title
Task Force to Study Court-Ordered Drug Testing
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1070 (HB1475)
Title
Baltimore County - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0150 Vehicle Laws - Accidents Resulting in Death or Life-Threatening Injury - Mandatory Drug and Alcohol Testing (Kara's Law) Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
1/30/2013 - 2:30 PM
HB0255 /CH0093 Allegany County - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights Allegany County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 93
Appropriations
2/05/2013 - 2:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0303 /CH0365 Task Force to Study Point-of-Care Testing for Lead Poisoning Delegate Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 365
Health and Government Operations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0346 /CH0031 (SB0216/CH0030) Harford County - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights Harford County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 31
Appropriations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0351 /CH0101 State Athletic Commission - Amateur Mixed Martial Arts and Amateur Kick Boxing - Licensing and Regulation Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 101
Economic Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0627 (SB0850) Vehicle Laws - Accidents Resulting in Injury - Mandatory Drug and Alcohol Testing Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0754 Environment - Reduction of Lead Risk in Housing - Qualified Offer Delegate Beidle 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/22/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB0834 Human Services - Public Assistance - Mandatory Drug Tests Delegate Stocksdale 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
HB0987 Punitive Damages - High-Risk Drunk Drivers Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1067 Environment - Reduction of Lead Risk in Housing - Blood Lead Level Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/22/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB1100 Maryland Compassionate Care Act Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2013 - 2:00 PM
Judiciary
3/08/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB1475 (SB1070) Baltimore County - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights Baltimore County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1490 Drunk and Drugged Driving - Refusal to Take a Blood or Breath Test - Prohibition Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0114 Health - Pregnant Women - Hepatitis B Testing Senator Benson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0178 Family Law - Blood or Genetic Test Results - Legal Finding of Paternity Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0216 /CH0030 (HB0346/CH0031) Harford County - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights Senator Glassman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 30
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2013 - 2:00 PM
Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0850 (HB0627) Vehicle Laws - Accidents Resulting in Injury - Mandatory Drug and Alcohol Testing Senator Forehand 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0959 (HB0765) Drugged Driving - Drug Recognition Expert - Testimony Senator Getty 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0989 Task Force to Study Court-Ordered Drug Testing Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB1070 (HB1475) Baltimore County - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM