Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Chemical Tests

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0115 /CH0221 (SB0721)
Title
Carroll County - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0430 /CH0247
Title
Drunk Driving - Accidents Resulting in Death - Sanctions for Administrative Per Se Offenses
Sponsor
Delegate Folden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0532
Title
Drunk and Drugged Driving - Death or Life-Threatening Injury - Mandatory Tests
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0615
Title
Parole and Probation - Sanctioning Prohibited - Citation
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0657 /CH0447 (SB0346)
Title
Pharmacists - Scope of Practice - Administration of Drugs
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0819
Title
Law Enforcement Officers - Alcohol and Drug Testing - Required
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0978 /CH0112
Title
HIV Testing - Informed Consent and Pretest Requirements - Modification
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0992 (SB0672)
Title
Public and Nonpublic Schools - Student Diabetes Management Program
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0346 (HB0657/CH0447)
Title
Pharmacists - Scope of Practice - Administration of Drugs
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0605
Title
Aggressive Drunk Driving - Punitive Damages
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0672 (HB0992)
Title
Public and Nonpublic Schools - Student Diabetes Management Program
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0721 (HB0115/CH0221)
Title
Carroll County - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0115 /CH0221 (SB0721) Carroll County - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights Carroll County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 221
Appropriations
2/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0430 /CH0247 Drunk Driving - Accidents Resulting in Death - Sanctions for Administrative Per Se Offenses Delegate Folden 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 247
Judiciary
3/04/2015 - 1:15 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0532 Drunk and Drugged Driving - Death or Life-Threatening Injury - Mandatory Tests Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:15 p.m.
Judiciary
3/04/2015 - 1:15 PM
HB0615 Parole and Probation - Sanctioning Prohibited - Citation Delegate Moon 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0657 /CH0447 (SB0346) Pharmacists - Scope of Practice - Administration of Drugs Delegate Krebs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 447
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0819 Law Enforcement Officers - Alcohol and Drug Testing - Required Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0978 /CH0112 HIV Testing - Informed Consent and Pretest Requirements - Modification Delegate Lam 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 112
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0992 (SB0672) Public and Nonpublic Schools - Student Diabetes Management Program Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0346 (HB0657/CH0447) Pharmacists - Scope of Practice - Administration of Drugs Senator Pugh 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0605 Aggressive Drunk Driving - Punitive Damages Senator Raskin 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0672 (HB0992) Public and Nonpublic Schools - Student Diabetes Management Program Senator Young 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0721 (HB0115/CH0221) Carroll County - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights Senator Ready 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM