Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Chesapeake Bay

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0068 /CH0461
Title
Hunting and Fishing - Discounted Licenses - Purple Heart Recipients
Sponsor
Delegate Carey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0129
Title
BayStat Program and BayStat Subcabinet - Renaming
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0281 (SB0266)
Title
Environment - On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems - Best Available Technology for Nitrogen Removal - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0384 /CH0369 (SB0343/CH0368)
Title
Bay Restoration Fund - Eligible Costs - Expansion
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0417 /CH0366 (SB0314/CH0367)
Title
Clean Water Commerce Act of 2017
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0885
Title
Environment - Chesapeake Bay - Vessel Sewage Discharge Areas
Sponsor
Delegate Howard, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0907 (SB0850)
Title
Chesapeake Bay Water Transportation Network
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0924 /CH0027
Title
Natural Resources - Oyster Management - Prohibited Actions
Sponsor
Delegate Gilchrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1339 (SB0554)
Title
Natural Resources - Gill Nets - Stretched Mesh Size
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0010 (SJ0008/JR0004)
Title
Chesapeake Bay Restoration - Federal Budget Blueprint Funding Reductions - Rescission Request
Sponsor
Delegate Barve
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0266 (HB0281)
Title
Environment - On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems - Best Available Technology for Nitrogen Removal
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0314 /CH0367 (HB0417/CH0366)
Title
Clean Water Commerce Act of 2017
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0343 /CH0368 (HB0384/CH0369)
Title
Bay Restoration Fund - Eligible Costs - Expansion
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0554 (HB1339)
Title
Natural Resources - Gill Nets - Mesh Size
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0850 (HB0907)
Title
Chesapeake Bay Water Transportation Network
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1067
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Chesapeake Children's Museum
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0008 /JR0004 (HJ0010)
Title
Chesapeake Bay Restoration - Federal Budget Blueprint Funding Reductions - Rescission Request
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0068 /CH0461 Hunting and Fishing - Discounted Licenses - Purple Heart Recipients Delegate Carey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 461
Environment and Transportation
1/25/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0129 BayStat Program and BayStat Subcabinet - Renaming Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0281 (SB0266) Environment - On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems - Best Available Technology for Nitrogen Removal - Prohibition Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0384 /CH0369 (SB0343/CH0368) Bay Restoration Fund - Eligible Costs - Expansion Delegate Adams 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 369
Environment and Transportation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0417 /CH0366 (SB0314/CH0367) Clean Water Commerce Act of 2017 Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 366
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0885 Environment - Chesapeake Bay - Vessel Sewage Discharge Areas Delegate Howard, S. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0907 (SB0850) Chesapeake Bay Water Transportation Network Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0924 /CH0027 Natural Resources - Oyster Management - Prohibited Actions Delegate Gilchrist 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 27
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1339 (SB0554) Natural Resources - Gill Nets - Stretched Mesh Size Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HJ0010 (SJ0008/JR0004) Chesapeake Bay Restoration - Federal Budget Blueprint Funding Reductions - Rescission Request Delegate Barve 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Rules and Executive Nominations
4/08/2017 - 10:00 AM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0266 (HB0281) Environment - On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems - Best Available Technology for Nitrogen Removal Senator Conway 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0314 /CH0367 (HB0417/CH0366) Clean Water Commerce Act of 2017 President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 367
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0343 /CH0368 (HB0384/CH0369) Bay Restoration Fund - Eligible Costs - Expansion Senator Eckardt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 368
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0554 (HB1339) Natural Resources - Gill Nets - Mesh Size Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0850 (HB0907) Chesapeake Bay Water Transportation Network Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1067 Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Chesapeake Children's Museum Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 2:00 PM
SJ0008 /JR0004 (HJ0010) Chesapeake Bay Restoration - Federal Budget Blueprint Funding Reductions - Rescission Request Senator Pinsky 2 2 Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 4
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
4/08/2017 - 10:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM