Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Child Abuse and Neglect

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0245 /CH0090
Title
Family Law - Substance-Exposed Newborns
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0302
Title
Maryland Medical Marijuana Act
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0428 /CH0114
Title
Child Abuse and Neglect - Reports and Records - Disclosure to Public Institutions of Higher Education
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0478 (SB0861)
Title
Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Simmons
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0588 (SB0473/CH0474)
Title
Baltimore City - Children - Records Access
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0631 /CH0380 (SB0534)
Title
Family Law - Preventing or Interfering with Report of Suspected Child Abuse or Neglect
Sponsor
Delegate Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0876
Title
Child Abuse - Failure to Report - Civil Penalty, Fund, and Task Force
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0897 (SB0570)
Title
Professional Licensing and Certification Governing Bodies - Child Abuse Mandated Reporter Training and Discipline
Sponsor
Delegate Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1186
Title
Task Force on the Prevention of Child Abuse and Neglect
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0094
Title
Child Abuse and Neglect - Notice and Reporting Requirements, Disclosure, and Task Force
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0473 /CH0474 (HB0588)
Title
Baltimore City - Children - Records Access
Sponsor
Senator Jones-Rodwell
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0534 (HB0631/CH0380)
Title
Family Law - Preventing or Interfering with Report of Suspected Child Abuse or Neglect
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0570 (HB0897)
Title
Professional Licensing and Certification Governing Bodies - Child Abuse Mandated Reporter Training and Discipline
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0861 (HB0478)
Title
Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0245 /CH0090 Family Law - Substance-Exposed Newborns Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 90
Judiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0302 Maryland Medical Marijuana Act Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2013 - 2:00 PM
Judiciary
3/08/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB0428 /CH0114 Child Abuse and Neglect - Reports and Records - Disclosure to Public Institutions of Higher Education Delegate Kelly, K. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 114
Judiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0478 (SB0861) Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties Delegate Simmons 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0588 (SB0473/CH0474) Baltimore City - Children - Records Access Delegate Anderson 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0631 /CH0380 (SB0534) Family Law - Preventing or Interfering with Report of Suspected Child Abuse or Neglect Delegate Hough 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 380
Judiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0876 Child Abuse - Failure to Report - Civil Penalty, Fund, and Task Force Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0897 (SB0570) Professional Licensing and Certification Governing Bodies - Child Abuse Mandated Reporter Training and Discipline Delegate Hough 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1186 Task Force on the Prevention of Child Abuse and Neglect Delegate McComas 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0094 Child Abuse and Neglect - Notice and Reporting Requirements, Disclosure, and Task Force Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB0473 /CH0474 (HB0588) Baltimore City - Children - Records Access Senator Jones-Rodwell 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 474
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0534 (HB0631/CH0380) Family Law - Preventing or Interfering with Report of Suspected Child Abuse or Neglect Senator Shank 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0570 (HB0897) Professional Licensing and Certification Governing Bodies - Child Abuse Mandated Reporter Training and Discipline Senator Shank 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0861 (HB0478) Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM