Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Child Abuse and Neglect

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0007 (SB0031/CH0152)
Title
Family Law - Child Abuse and Neglect - Expungement of Reports and Records - Time Period
Sponsor
Delegate Sophocleus
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0077 /CH0611
Title
Family Law - Missing Children - Reporting Requirements and Repeal of Advisory Council
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0094
Title
Criminal Law - Child Abuse Resulting in Death - Life Imprisonment
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0245 /CH0375 (SB0310/CH0374)
Title
Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0374 (SB0603/CH0567)
Title
Criminal Law - Pretrial Release - Prior Crimes
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0811
Title
Juvenile Services - Child Victims of Human Trafficking
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0825 (SB0577)
Title
Child Protection - Reporting - Threat of Harm
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0836
Title
Educational Institutions - Notice of Criminal Activity and Threats to Safety
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0847
Title
Criminal Procedure - Crime of Violence - Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Rey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1215 (SB0069)
Title
Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse - Statute of Limitations
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1232 (SB0978)
Title
Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1396 (SB0960)
Title
Domestic Violence - Education and Definition of Abuse
Sponsor
Delegate Angel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1452 (SB0902)
Title
Criminal Law - Veterans - Medical Marijuana
Sponsor
Delegate Vogt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0031 /CH0152 (HB0007)
Title
Family Law - Child Abuse and Neglect - Expungement of Reports and Records - Time Period
Sponsor
Senator DeGrange
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0069 (HB1215)
Title
Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse - Statute of Limitations
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0122
Title
Criminal Procedure - Reconsiderations of Sentences - Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0282 /CH0185
Title
Early Childhood Development - Transfer of Provisions
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0310 /CH0374 (HB0245/CH0375)
Title
Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0577 (HB0825)
Title
Child Protection - Reporting - Threat of Harm
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0603 /CH0567 (HB0374)
Title
Criminal Law - Pretrial Release - Prior Crimes
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0902 (HB1452)
Title
Criminal Law - Veterans - Medical Marijuana
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0960 (HB1396)
Title
Family Law - Domestic Violence - Definition of Abuse
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0978 (HB1232)
Title
Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1096
Title
Child Abuse and Neglect - Information Regarding Parents Responsible for Child Abuse or Neglect
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0007 (SB0031/CH0152) Family Law - Child Abuse and Neglect - Expungement of Reports and Records - Time Period Delegate Sophocleus 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB0077 /CH0611 Family Law - Missing Children - Reporting Requirements and Repeal of Advisory Council Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 611
Judiciary
1/28/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0094 Criminal Law - Child Abuse Resulting in Death - Life Imprisonment Delegate Wilson, B. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0245 /CH0375 (SB0310/CH0374) Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 375
Judiciary
2/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0374 (SB0603/CH0567) Criminal Law - Pretrial Release - Prior Crimes Delegate Anderson 4 2 Veto sustained (0-135)
Judiciary
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0811 Juvenile Services - Child Victims of Human Trafficking Delegate Morales 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB0825 (SB0577) Child Protection - Reporting - Threat of Harm Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0836 Educational Institutions - Notice of Criminal Activity and Threats to Safety Delegate Arentz 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB0847 Criminal Procedure - Crime of Violence - Definition Delegate Rey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1215 (SB0069) Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse - Statute of Limitations Delegate Wilson, C. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1232 (SB0978) Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1396 (SB0960) Domestic Violence - Education and Definition of Abuse Delegate Angel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1452 (SB0902) Criminal Law - Veterans - Medical Marijuana Delegate Vogt 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0031 /CH0152 (HB0007) Family Law - Child Abuse and Neglect - Expungement of Reports and Records - Time Period Senator DeGrange 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 152
Judicial Proceedings
1/27/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0069 (HB1215) Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse - Statute of Limitations Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0122 Criminal Procedure - Reconsiderations of Sentences - Reporting Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2016 - 1:30 PM
SB0282 /CH0185 Early Childhood Development - Transfer of Provisions Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 185
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0310 /CH0374 (HB0245/CH0375) Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report Senator Raskin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 374
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0577 (HB0825) Child Protection - Reporting - Threat of Harm Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0603 /CH0567 (HB0374) Criminal Law - Pretrial Release - Prior Crimes Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 567
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0902 (HB1452) Criminal Law - Veterans - Medical Marijuana Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0960 (HB1396) Family Law - Domestic Violence - Definition of Abuse Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0978 (HB1232) Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1096 Child Abuse and Neglect - Information Regarding Parents Responsible for Child Abuse or Neglect Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM