Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Child Care

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0058 (SB0112/CH0006)
Title
Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0248 /CH0595 (SB0181/CH0596)
Title
Education - Child Care Subsidies - Mandatory Funding Level
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0521
Title
Procurement Preferences - Maryland Child Care Act
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0810 (SB0870/CH0432)
Title
Income Tax - Child and Dependent Care Tax Credit - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1113 /CH0510 (SB0640/CH0511)
Title
State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1201 (SB0972)
Title
Task Force on Educational Outcomes of Pregnant and Parenting Students in High School and GED Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Cain
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1264 (SB0902)
Title
Public Health - Products Containing a Flame-Retardant Chemical - Prohibition on Import or Sale
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1347 /CH0737
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt – Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0011 /CH0082
Title
Distressed Counties - References and Definitions
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0112 /CH0006 (HB0058)
Title
Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0181 /CH0596 (HB0248/CH0595)
Title
Education - Child Care Subsidies - Mandatory Funding Level
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0492
Title
Investment in Job Skills Act of 2019
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0640 /CH0511 (HB1113/CH0510)
Title
State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0859
Title
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Advertisements
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0870 /CH0432 (HB0810)
Title
Income Tax - Child and Dependent Care Tax Credit - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0902 (HB1264)
Title
Public Health - Products Containing a Flame-Retardant Chemical - Prohibition on Import or Sale
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0972 (HB1201)
Title
Task Force on Educational Outcomes of Pregnant and Parenting Students in High School and GED Programs
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0058 (SB0112/CH0006) Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions Speaker 6 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/25/2019 - 2:00 PM
HB0248 /CH0595 (SB0181/CH0596) Education - Child Care Subsidies - Mandatory Funding Level Delegate Jones 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 595
Appropriations
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0521 Procurement Preferences - Maryland Child Care Act Delegate Queen 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0810 (SB0870/CH0432) Income Tax - Child and Dependent Care Tax Credit - Alterations Delegate Kelly 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Ways and Means
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1113 /CH0510 (SB0640/CH0511) State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act Delegate Hettleman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 510
Appropriations
3/01/2019 - 1:30 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules
HB1201 (SB0972) Task Force on Educational Outcomes of Pregnant and Parenting Students in High School and GED Programs Delegate Cain 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1264 (SB0902) Public Health - Products Containing a Flame-Retardant Chemical - Prohibition on Import or Sale Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2019 - 2:00 PM
HB1347 /CH0737 Prior Authorizations of State Debt – Alterations Delegate Jones 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 737
Appropriations
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2019 - 12:45 PM
SB0011 /CH0082 Distressed Counties - References and Definitions Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 82
Finance
1/23/2019 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0112 /CH0006 (HB0058) Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions President 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 6
Rules
2/13/2019 - 11:00 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/04/2019 - 2:00 PM
SB0181 /CH0596 (HB0248/CH0595) Education - Child Care Subsidies - Mandatory Funding Level Senator King 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 596
Budget and Taxation
2/05/2019 - 2:30 PM
Appropriations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0492 Investment in Job Skills Act of 2019 Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0640 /CH0511 (HB1113/CH0510) State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 511
Rules
3/05/2019 - 11:30 AM
Appropriations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0859 Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Advertisements Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2019 - 12:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0870 /CH0432 (HB0810) Income Tax - Child and Dependent Care Tax Credit - Alterations Senator King 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 432
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0902 (HB1264) Public Health - Products Containing a Flame-Retardant Chemical - Prohibition on Import or Sale Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB0972 (HB1201) Task Force on Educational Outcomes of Pregnant and Parenting Students in High School and GED Programs Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:19 PM