Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Child Custody

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0259
Title
Family Law - Child Support - Custody and Visitation
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0421 (SB1019)
Title
Family Law - Grandparent Visitation
Sponsor
Delegate Jalisi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0646 (SB0593)
Title
Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0976
Title
CINA, Guardianship, Adoption, Custody, and Visitation - Disability of Parent, Guardian, Custodian, or Party
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1120
Title
Family Law - Automatic Injunction
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1232 (SB0978)
Title
Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1379 (SB0813)
Title
Child Custody and Visitation - Deployed Parents
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1386 (SB0962)
Title
Child Custody - Rebuttable Presumption of Joint Custody
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1452 (SB0902)
Title
Criminal Law - Veterans - Medical Marijuana
Sponsor
Delegate Vogt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1484 (SB0015)
Title
Child Placement - Prohibition on Human Trafficking, Restrictions on Advertising, and Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0015 (HB1484)
Title
Child Placement - Prohibition on Human Trafficking, Restrictions on Advertising, and Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0077 /CH0157
Title
Human Resources - Transition Planning for Foster Youth
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0081
Title
Juvenile Law - Continuum of Care - Repeal of Termination Date
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0358
Title
Family Law - Divorce on Grounds of Mutual Consent - Parties With Minor Children
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0593 (HB0646)
Title
Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0704
Title
CINA Guardianship, Adoption, Custody, and Visitation - Blindness of Parent, Guardian, Custodian, or Party
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0765 /CH0423
Title
CINA, Guardianship, Adoption, Custody, and Visitation - Disability of Parent, Guardian, Custodian, or Party
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0813 (HB1379)
Title
Child Custody and Visitation - Deployed Parents
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0902 (HB1452)
Title
Criminal Law - Veterans - Medical Marijuana
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0962 (HB1386)
Title
Child Custody - Rebuttable Presumption of Joint Custody
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0978 (HB1232)
Title
Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1019 (HB0421)
Title
Family Law - Grandparent Visitation
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0259 Family Law - Child Support - Custody and Visitation Delegate Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0421 (SB1019) Family Law - Grandparent Visitation Delegate Jalisi 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0646 (SB0593) Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act) Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0976 CINA, Guardianship, Adoption, Custody, and Visitation - Disability of Parent, Guardian, Custodian, or Party Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Judiciary
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB1120 Family Law - Automatic Injunction Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1232 (SB0978) Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1379 (SB0813) Child Custody and Visitation - Deployed Parents Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1386 (SB0962) Child Custody - Rebuttable Presumption of Joint Custody Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1452 (SB0902) Criminal Law - Veterans - Medical Marijuana Delegate Vogt 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB1484 (SB0015) Child Placement - Prohibition on Human Trafficking, Restrictions on Advertising, and Reporting Requirements Delegate Wilson, C. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
SB0015 (HB1484) Child Placement - Prohibition on Human Trafficking, Restrictions on Advertising, and Reporting Requirements Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/27/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0077 /CH0157 Human Resources - Transition Planning for Foster Youth Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 157
Judicial Proceedings
1/27/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0081 Juvenile Law - Continuum of Care - Repeal of Termination Date Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
1/21/2016 - 1:30 PM
SB0358 Family Law - Divorce on Grounds of Mutual Consent - Parties With Minor Children Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0593 (HB0646) Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act) Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0704 CINA Guardianship, Adoption, Custody, and Visitation - Blindness of Parent, Guardian, Custodian, or Party Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0765 /CH0423 CINA, Guardianship, Adoption, Custody, and Visitation - Disability of Parent, Guardian, Custodian, or Party Senator Raskin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 423
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0813 (HB1379) Child Custody and Visitation - Deployed Parents Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0902 (HB1452) Criminal Law - Veterans - Medical Marijuana Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0962 (HB1386) Child Custody - Rebuttable Presumption of Joint Custody Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0978 (HB1232) Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1019 (HB0421) Family Law - Grandparent Visitation Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM