Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Child Custody -see also- Parents and Guardians

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0519 /CH0438 (SB0697/CH0437)
Title
Family Law - Parentage and Adoption
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0665 (SB0811)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Family Law Services for Sustained Safety Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0731 (SB0638)
Title
Child Support - Shared Physical Custody
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1030
Title
Civil Law – Jury Proceedings – Fundamental Rights
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0567 /CH0052
Title
Workgroup to Study Child Custody Court Proceedings Involving Child Abuse or Domestic Violence Allegations
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0620
Title
Family Law - Child Support - Custody and Visitation
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0638 (HB0731)
Title
Child Support - Shared Physical Custody
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0697 /CH0437 (HB0519/CH0438)
Title
Family Law - Parentage and Adoption
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0811 (HB0665)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Family Law Services for Sustained Safety Fund
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1042
Title
Family Law - Removal of Child From United States - Injunction
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0519 /CH0438 (SB0697/CH0437) Family Law - Parentage and Adoption Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 438
Judiciary
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Judicial Proceedings
HB0665 (SB0811) Criminal Procedure - Family Law Services for Sustained Safety Fund Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0731 (SB0638) Child Support - Shared Physical Custody Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1030 Civil Law – Jury Proceedings – Fundamental Rights Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0567 /CH0052 Workgroup to Study Child Custody Court Proceedings Involving Child Abuse or Domestic Violence Allegations Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 52
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
4/03/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0620 Family Law - Child Support - Custody and Visitation Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0638 (HB0731) Child Support - Shared Physical Custody Senator Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
4/03/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0697 /CH0437 (HB0519/CH0438) Family Law - Parentage and Adoption Senator Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 437
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0811 (HB0665) Criminal Procedure - Family Law Services for Sustained Safety Fund Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB1042 Family Law - Removal of Child From United States - Injunction Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:19 PM