Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Cigarettes -see also- Smoking

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0027
Title
Clean Indoor Air Act - Use of Electronic Cigarette Devices - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1052 /CH0012 (SB0703)
Title
Alcohol and Tobacco Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Miller
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1159
Title
Cigarette Restitution Fund - Establishment of Account
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1169 /CH0396 (SB0895)
Title
Business Regulation - Tobacco Products and Electronic Smoking Devices - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1185 (SB0708)
Title
Electronic Nicotine Delivery Systems - Prohibitions and Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Carey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1217 (SB0497)
Title
Pharmacists - Aids for the Cessation of Tobacco Product Use - Prescribing and Dispensing
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1351 (SB0310/CH0314)
Title
Baltimore City - Unpackaged Cigarettes - Prohibition on Sale
Sponsor
Delegate Bridges
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0310 /CH0314 (HB1351)
Title
Baltimore City - Unpackaged Cigarettes - Prohibition on Sale
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0703 (HB1052/CH0012)
Title
Alcohol, Tobacco, and Motor Fuel Commission
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0708 (HB1185)
Title
Electronic Nicotine Delivery Systems - Prohibitions and Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0895 (HB1169/CH0396)
Title
Business Regulation - Tobacco Products and Electronic Smoking Devices - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0027 Clean Indoor Air Act - Use of Electronic Cigarette Devices - Prohibition Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB1052 /CH0012 (SB0703) Alcohol and Tobacco Commission Delegate Miller 4 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 12
Economic Matters
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1159 Cigarette Restitution Fund - Establishment of Account Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1169 /CH0396 (SB0895) Business Regulation - Tobacco Products and Electronic Smoking Devices - Revisions Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 396
Economic Matters
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Finance
HB1185 (SB0708) Electronic Nicotine Delivery Systems - Prohibitions and Requirements Delegate Carey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB1217 (SB0497) Pharmacists - Aids for the Cessation of Tobacco Product Use - Prescribing and Dispensing Delegate Kelly 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1351 (SB0310/CH0314) Baltimore City - Unpackaged Cigarettes - Prohibition on Sale Delegate Bridges 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0310 /CH0314 (HB1351) Baltimore City - Unpackaged Cigarettes - Prohibition on Sale Senator Hayes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 314
Finance
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/03/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0703 (HB1052/CH0012) Alcohol, Tobacco, and Motor Fuel Commission Senator Kramer 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0708 (HB1185) Electronic Nicotine Delivery Systems - Prohibitions and Requirements Senator Beidle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0895 (HB1169/CH0396) Business Regulation - Tobacco Products and Electronic Smoking Devices - Revisions Senator Kelley 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters and Health and Government Operations
Finance
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:19 PM