Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Cigarettes -see also- Smoking and Vaping

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0003 (SB0233)
Title
Business Regulation – Tobacco Products – Electronic Smoking Devices, Prohibition on Flavoring, and Sales to Military Members
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0732
Title
Taxation – Tobacco Tax, Sales and Use Tax, and Digital Advertising Gross Revenues Tax
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0003
Title
Electronic Smoking Devices, Other Tobacco Products, and Cigarettes - Taxation and Regulation
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0233 (HB0003)
Title
Business Regulation - Flavored Tobacco Products - Prohibition
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0410
Title
Electronic Smoking Devices - Flavor Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0937
Title
Baltimore City - Cigarettes, Other Tobacco Products, and Electronic Smoking Devices - Local Laws Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0003 (SB0233) Business Regulation – Tobacco Products – Electronic Smoking Devices, Prohibition on Flavoring, and Sales to Military Members Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Finance
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0732 Taxation – Tobacco Tax, Sales and Use Tax, and Digital Advertising Gross Revenues Tax Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Ways and Means
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Budget and Taxation
SB0003 Electronic Smoking Devices, Other Tobacco Products, and Cigarettes - Taxation and Regulation Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/29/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0233 (HB0003) Business Regulation - Flavored Tobacco Products - Prohibition President 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0410 Electronic Smoking Devices - Flavor Prohibition Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0937 Baltimore City - Cigarettes, Other Tobacco Products, and Electronic Smoking Devices - Local Laws Authorization Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/8/2020 1:46 PM