Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Citations

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0204 /CH0290
Title
Traffic Control Signal Monitoring Systems – Yellow Signal Compliance
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0277
Title
Criminal Law - Alcohol Offenses and Gaming - Civil Offenses (Decriminalization of Petty Nonviolent Offenses Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0323 (SB0248)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Charging Procedures and Documents - Citation
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0325 (SB0446)
Title
Criminal Law - Use or Possession of a Controlled Dangerous Substance - De Minimis Quantity
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0492
Title
Vehicle Laws - Civil Violations - Administrative Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Ali
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0618
Title
Criminal Law – Cruelty to Animals – Traveling Elephant Acts
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0672
Title
Vehicle Laws - Intersections - Prohibited Acts
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0749 (SB0551)
Title
Vehicle Laws – Dedicated Bus Lanes – Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0953 (SB0456)
Title
Tobacco Products - Minimum Age and Civil Fines
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1094 /CH0785
Title
Distribution of Electronic Cigarettes to Minors - Prohibition and Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1151
Title
Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring Systems
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1172 /CH0520 (SB0558)
Title
Oyster Poaching - Administrative Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1662 /CH0237
Title
Business Regulation – Retail Pet Stores
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1718
Title
Vehicle Laws - Civil Penalty for Failure to Pay Video Toll - Limitation
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1769
Title
Motor Vehicles - Automated Enforcement - Leased Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0248 (HB0323)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Charging Procedures and Documents - Citation
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0446 (HB0325)
Title
Criminal Law - Use or Possession of a Controlled Dangerous Substance - De Minimis Quantity
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0456 (HB0953)
Title
Tobacco Products - Minimum Age and Civil Fines
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0551 (HB0749)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Bus Lane Monitoring Cameras - Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0558 (HB1172/CH0520)
Title
Oyster Poaching - Administrative Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0628
Title
Criminal Law – Alcohol Offenses and Gaming – Civil Offenses
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0204 /CH0290 Traffic Control Signal Monitoring Systems – Yellow Signal Compliance Delegate Korman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 290
Environment and Transportation
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0277 Criminal Law - Alcohol Offenses and Gaming - Civil Offenses (Decriminalization of Petty Nonviolent Offenses Act) Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
Ways and Means
HB0323 (SB0248) Criminal Procedure - Charging Procedures and Documents - Citation Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0325 (SB0446) Criminal Law - Use or Possession of a Controlled Dangerous Substance - De Minimis Quantity Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
1/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0492 Vehicle Laws - Civil Violations - Administrative Penalties Delegate Ali 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0618 Criminal Law – Cruelty to Animals – Traveling Elephant Acts Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0672 Vehicle Laws - Intersections - Prohibited Acts Delegate Carr 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0749 (SB0551) Vehicle Laws – Dedicated Bus Lanes – Enforcement Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0953 (SB0456) Tobacco Products - Minimum Age and Civil Fines Delegate Morales 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Economic Matters
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB1094 /CH0785 Distribution of Electronic Cigarettes to Minors - Prohibition and Penalties Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 785
Economic Matters
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1151 Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring Systems Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1172 /CH0520 (SB0558) Oyster Poaching - Administrative Penalties Delegate Jacobs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 520
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1662 /CH0237 Business Regulation – Retail Pet Stores Delegate Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 237
Economic Matters
3/12/2018 - 2:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1718 Vehicle Laws - Civil Penalty for Failure to Pay Video Toll - Limitation Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1769 Motor Vehicles - Automated Enforcement - Leased Vehicles Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0248 (HB0323) Criminal Procedure - Charging Procedures and Documents - Citation Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/01/2018 - 2:00 PM
SB0446 (HB0325) Criminal Law - Use or Possession of a Controlled Dangerous Substance - De Minimis Quantity Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0456 (HB0953) Tobacco Products - Minimum Age and Civil Fines Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0551 (HB0749) Vehicle Laws - Bus Lane Monitoring Cameras - Authorization Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0558 (HB1172/CH0520) Oyster Poaching - Administrative Penalties Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0628 Criminal Law – Alcohol Offenses and Gaming – Civil Offenses Senator Smith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM