Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Civil Rights Commission

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0172 (SB0728)
Title
Home Act of 2017
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0214
Title
Discrimination in Employment - Conditions Related to Pregnancy or Childbirth
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0254
Title
State Government - Closed Captioning Activation Required Without Request
Sponsor
Delegate Angel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0367
Title
Independent Congressional Redistricting Commission - Mid-Atlantic States Regional Districting Process
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0696 (SB0849)
Title
Nonpublic Elementary and Secondary Schools - Discrimination - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1175 (SB0834)
Title
Human Relations - Discrimination by a Place of Public Accommodation - Enforcement and Remedies
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1208 (SB0616)
Title
Victims and Witnesses - U Nonimmigrant Status - Certification of Victim Helpfulness
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0616 (HB1208)
Title
Victims and Witnesses - U Nonimmigrant Status - Certification of Victim Helpfulness
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0728 (HB0172)
Title
Home Act of 2017
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0834 (HB1175)
Title
Human Relations - Discrimination by a Place of Public Accommodation - Enforcement and Remedies
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0849 (HB0696)
Title
Nonpublic Elementary and Secondary Schools - Discrimination - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0971 (HB0919)
Title
Procurement - Nondiscrimination Clauses and State Policy Prohibiting Discrimination
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0172 (SB0728) Home Act of 2017 Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0214 Discrimination in Employment - Conditions Related to Pregnancy or Childbirth Delegate Morales 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0254 State Government - Closed Captioning Activation Required Without Request Delegate Angel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0367 Independent Congressional Redistricting Commission - Mid-Atlantic States Regional Districting Process Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0696 (SB0849) Nonpublic Elementary and Secondary Schools - Discrimination - Prohibition Delegate McCray 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1175 (SB0834) Human Relations - Discrimination by a Place of Public Accommodation - Enforcement and Remedies Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1208 (SB0616) Victims and Witnesses - U Nonimmigrant Status - Certification of Victim Helpfulness Delegate Morales 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Ramirez)
Judiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0616 (HB1208) Victims and Witnesses - U Nonimmigrant Status - Certification of Victim Helpfulness Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0728 (HB0172) Home Act of 2017 Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0834 (HB1175) Human Relations - Discrimination by a Place of Public Accommodation - Enforcement and Remedies Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0849 (HB0696) Nonpublic Elementary and Secondary Schools - Discrimination - Prohibition Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0971 (HB0919) Procurement - Nondiscrimination Clauses and State Policy Prohibiting Discrimination Senator Kagan 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM