Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Clams

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0096 /CH0080
Title
Natural Resources - Restricted Shellfish Harvest Areas - Water Testing
Sponsor
Chair, Environmental Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0306 (SB0464/CH0057)
Title
Natural Resources - Aquaculture - Shellfish Nursery Permits
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0059 /CH0173
Title
Natural Resources - Fish and Fisheries
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0464 /CH0057 (HB0306)
Title
Natural Resources - Aquaculture - Shellfish Nursery Permits
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0096 /CH0080 Natural Resources - Restricted Shellfish Harvest Areas - Water Testing Chair, Environmental Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 80
Environmental Matters
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0306 (SB0464/CH0057) Natural Resources - Aquaculture - Shellfish Nursery Permits Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environmental Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0059 /CH0173 Natural Resources - Fish and Fisheries Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 173
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/15/2013 - 2:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0464 /CH0057 (HB0306) Natural Resources - Aquaculture - Shellfish Nursery Permits Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 57
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM