Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Clams

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0319 /CH0260
Title
Oysters and Clams - Dredging by Auxiliary Yawl - Authorized Boats
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0916
Title
Study on Harvesting Hard-Shell Clams in the Atlantic Coastal Bays and Aquaculture Areas in the Chincoteague Bay
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0319 /CH0260 Oysters and Clams - Dredging by Auxiliary Yawl - Authorized Boats Delegate Jacobs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 260
Environment and Transportation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0916 Study on Harvesting Hard-Shell Clams in the Atlantic Coastal Bays and Aquaculture Areas in the Chincoteague Bay Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2016 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM
Click to return on the top page