Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Clerks of Court

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0174 (SB0375)
Title
Election Law - Local Public Campaign Financing - Expansion
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0286 /CH0809 (SB0668/CH0810)
Title
Circuit Court Clerks - Salary Increase
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0631 /CH0540
Title
Somerset County - Fines and Forfeitures - Distribution
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0733
Title
Courts - Civil Court Records - Shielding
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0770
Title
Courts - Appointments to Vacant Offices by the Judiciary - Same Party as Predecessor
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0873 (SB0659/CH0720)
Title
Corporations – Transfer of Assets and Exchange of Shares of Stock
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0887
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Specific Individuals or Mass Murder
Sponsor
Delegate Shoemaker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1093 /CH0516
Title
Maryland Uniform Real Property Electronic Recording Act
Sponsor
Delegate Platt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1304
Title
Family Law – Minors – Emancipation (Emancipation of Minors Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1411 (SB0346)
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Reinstatement
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1448 /CH0792
Title
Clerks of the Courts - Traffic Fines - Installment Payments
Sponsor
Delegate Vallario
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1520 (SB0766)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release Services Program - Victim Notification
Sponsor
Delegate Vallario
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1737 (SB1266)
Title
Charles County - Cigarette Retailers - County License Fee
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0178 (HB1020)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System – Board of Trustees – Oath
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0346 (HB1411)
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Reinstatement
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0375 (HB0174)
Title
Election Law - Local Public Campaign Financing - Expansion
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0442
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Electronic Telecommunications Enforcement Resource System - Body Attachments
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0578 /CH0424 (HB0633/CH0423)
Title
Secretary of State – Address Confidentiality Programs – Shielding of Real Property Records
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0621 /CH0636
Title
Real Property - Deletion of Ownership Restrictions Based on Race, Religious Belief, or National Origin
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0668 /CH0810 (HB0286/CH0809)
Title
Circuit Court Clerks - Salary Increase
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0766 (HB1520)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release Services Program - Victim Notification
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0816
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1195
Title
Maryland Uniform Real Property Electronic Recording Act
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1266 (HB1737)
Title
Charles County - Cigarette Retailers - County License Fee
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0174 (SB0375) Election Law - Local Public Campaign Financing - Expansion Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0286 /CH0809 (SB0668/CH0810) Circuit Court Clerks - Salary Increase Delegate Dumais 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 809
Judiciary
1/31/2018 - 2:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0631 /CH0540 Somerset County - Fines and Forfeitures - Distribution Delegate Otto 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 540
Judiciary
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0733 Courts - Civil Court Records - Shielding Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0770 Courts - Appointments to Vacant Offices by the Judiciary - Same Party as Predecessor Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0873 (SB0659/CH0720) Corporations – Transfer of Assets and Exchange of Shares of Stock Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Economic Matters
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0887 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Specific Individuals or Mass Murder Delegate Shoemaker 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1093 /CH0516 Maryland Uniform Real Property Electronic Recording Act Delegate Platt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 516
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1304 Family Law – Minors – Emancipation (Emancipation of Minors Act) Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1411 (SB0346) Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Reinstatement Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1448 /CH0792 Clerks of the Courts - Traffic Fines - Installment Payments Delegate Vallario 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 792
Judiciary
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1520 (SB0766) Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release Services Program - Victim Notification Delegate Vallario 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1737 (SB1266) Charles County - Cigarette Retailers - County License Fee Charles County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
SB0178 (HB1020) State Retirement and Pension System – Board of Trustees – Oath Senator Guzzone 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Budget and Taxation
1/25/2018 - 9:30 AM
Appropriations
3/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0346 (HB1411) Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Reinstatement Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0375 (HB0174) Election Law - Local Public Campaign Financing - Expansion Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0442 Public Safety - Maryland Electronic Telecommunications Enforcement Resource System - Body Attachments Senator Norman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0578 /CH0424 (HB0633/CH0423) Secretary of State – Address Confidentiality Programs – Shielding of Real Property Records Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 424
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0621 /CH0636 Real Property - Deletion of Ownership Restrictions Based on Race, Religious Belief, or National Origin Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 636
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0668 /CH0810 (HB0286/CH0809) Circuit Court Clerks - Salary Increase Senator Zirkin 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 810
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0766 (HB1520) Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release Services Program - Victim Notification Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 3:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2018 - 3:00 PM
SB0816 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1195 Maryland Uniform Real Property Electronic Recording Act Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB1266 (HB1737) Charles County - Cigarette Retailers - County License Fee Senator Middleton 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/05/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM