Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Clerks of Court

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0254
Title
Clerks of the Courts - Maryland Judiciary Case Search - Information on Judge or Magistrate
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0424 /CH0121 (SB0141/CH0122)
Title
Washington County - Disposition of Marriage Ceremony Fee
Sponsor
Delegate Corderman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0624
Title
Montgomery County - Voting Methods MC 29-19
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0656 (SB0771)
Title
Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0756
Title
Criminal Procedure - Cameras in the Courtroom - Criminal Sentencing Hearings
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1147
Title
Family Law - Minors - Emancipation (Emancipation of Minors Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1169 /CH0396 (SB0895)
Title
Business Regulation - Tobacco Products and Electronic Smoking Devices - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1198 /CH0373
Title
Human Trafficking – Required Posting
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1267 (SB0925)
Title
Licensing and Registration - Unpaid Fines or Failure to Appear - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1312
Title
Clerks of the Courts - Maryland Judiciary Case Search - Notation of Plea Agreement
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1368
Title
Vehicle Laws - Move Over Safety Monitoring System - Authorization
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1405 /CH0311
Title
Howard County - Transfer Tax - Collection by Director of Finance Ho. Co. 30-19
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0141 /CH0122 (HB0424/CH0121)
Title
Washington County - Disposition of Marriage Ceremony Fee
Sponsor
Washington County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0295
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0644
Title
Circuit Court Fines, Penalties, and Forfeitures - Funding - Drug Treatment and Education
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0678 /CH0407
Title
State Government - Notarial Acts and Notaries Public
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0735
Title
State Employees and Teachers - Cash Balance Plan
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0771 (HB0656)
Title
Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0895 (HB1169/CH0396)
Title
Business Regulation - Tobacco Products and Electronic Smoking Devices - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0925 (HB1267)
Title
Licensing and Registration - Unpaid Fines or Failure to Appear - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1004 /CH0770
Title
Election Law - Election Calendar and Processes - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0254 Clerks of the Courts - Maryland Judiciary Case Search - Information on Judge or Magistrate Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0424 /CH0121 (SB0141/CH0122) Washington County - Disposition of Marriage Ceremony Fee Delegate Corderman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 121
Judiciary
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0624 Montgomery County - Voting Methods MC 29-19 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0656 (SB0771) Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB0756 Criminal Procedure - Cameras in the Courtroom - Criminal Sentencing Hearings Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/01/2019 - 11:30 AM
HB1147 Family Law - Minors - Emancipation (Emancipation of Minors Act) Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Judiciary
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB1169 /CH0396 (SB0895) Business Regulation - Tobacco Products and Electronic Smoking Devices - Revisions Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 396
Economic Matters
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Finance
HB1198 /CH0373 Human Trafficking – Required Posting Delegate Cox 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 373
Judiciary
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB1267 (SB0925) Licensing and Registration - Unpaid Fines or Failure to Appear - Penalties Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1312 Clerks of the Courts - Maryland Judiciary Case Search - Notation of Plea Agreement Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1368 Vehicle Laws - Move Over Safety Monitoring System - Authorization Delegate Healey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1405 /CH0311 Howard County - Transfer Tax - Collection by Director of Finance Ho. Co. 30-19 Howard County Delegation 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 311
Ways and Means
3/15/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0141 /CH0122 (HB0424/CH0121) Washington County - Disposition of Marriage Ceremony Fee Washington County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 122
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2019 - 2:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0295 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0644 Circuit Court Fines, Penalties, and Forfeitures - Funding - Drug Treatment and Education Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 9:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2019 - 9:00 AM
SB0678 /CH0407 State Government - Notarial Acts and Notaries Public Senator Jennings 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 407
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2019 - 12:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0735 State Employees and Teachers - Cash Balance Plan Senator Serafini 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 8:30 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/28/2019 - 8:30 AM
SB0771 (HB0656) Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0895 (HB1169/CH0396) Business Regulation - Tobacco Products and Electronic Smoking Devices - Revisions Senator Kelley 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters and Health and Government Operations
Finance
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Health and Government Operations
SB0925 (HB1267) Licensing and Registration - Unpaid Fines or Failure to Appear - Penalties Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB1004 /CH0770 Election Law - Election Calendar and Processes - Revisions Senator Pinsky 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 770
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:20 PM