Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Clinics

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0772 /CH0323 (SB0765/CH0324)
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Reimbursement for Services Provided by Certified Peer Recovery Specialists - Workgroup and Report
Sponsor
Delegate Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0779
Title
Maryland Healthy Working Families Act - Exemption - Facility With On-Site Health Clinic
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1726
Title
Maryland Dentistry Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0765 /CH0324 (HB0772/CH0323)
Title
Maryland Department of Health – Reimbursement for Services Provided by Certified Peer Recovery Specialists – Workgroup and Report
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0772 /CH0323 (SB0765/CH0324) Maryland Department of Health - Reimbursement for Services Provided by Certified Peer Recovery Specialists - Workgroup and Report Delegate Hayes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 323
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0779 Maryland Healthy Working Families Act - Exemption - Facility With On-Site Health Clinic Delegate Wivell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1726 Maryland Dentistry Act - Revisions Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0765 /CH0324 (HB0772/CH0323) Maryland Department of Health – Reimbursement for Services Provided by Certified Peer Recovery Specialists – Workgroup and Report Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 324
Finance
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM