Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Coastal Bays

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0058 /CH0380 (SB0073)
Title
Talbot County - Chesapeake Bay Critical Area - Prosecution or Civil Suit for Certain Violations
Sponsor
Delegate Haddaway-Riccio
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0162 (SB0172/CH0464)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2014
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0073 (HB0058/CH0380)
Title
Talbot County - Chesapeake Bay Critical Area - Prosecution or Civil Suit for Certain Violations
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0172 /CH0464 (HB0162)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2014
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0058 /CH0380 (SB0073) Talbot County - Chesapeake Bay Critical Area - Prosecution or Civil Suit for Certain Violations Delegate Haddaway-Riccio 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 380
Environmental Matters
1/29/2014 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0162 (SB0172/CH0464) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2014 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0073 (HB0058/CH0380) Talbot County - Chesapeake Bay Critical Area - Prosecution or Civil Suit for Certain Violations Senator Colburn 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0172 /CH0464 (HB0162) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2014 President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 464
Budget and Taxation
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM