Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Coastal Bays

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0054
Title
Natural Resources - Lands Formed by Excavation Materials - Transfer of Authority
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0298 /CH0017 (SB0448/CH0754)
Title
Oysters - Tributary-Scale Sanctuaries - Protection and Restoration
Sponsor
Delegate Busch
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0349 /CH0259 (SB0361/CH0260)
Title
Natural Resources – Special Charter Boat License – Alteration
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0408
Title
Natural Resources - Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays Trust Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0532 (SB0744)
Title
Protecting Natural Resources and Preserving Productive Farms – Commission on the Development of a Blueprint for Solar Energy in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0703 /CH0517 (SB0505/CH0518)
Title
Environmental Violations - Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0904 (SB0546/CH0760)
Title
Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Monitoring and Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1196
Title
Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays Critical Area - Buffer Establishment and Buffer Management Plan - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1309 (SB0876)
Title
Aquaculture - Leases in Water Column - Riparian Right of First Refusal
Sponsor
Delegate Crosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0095 /CH0261
Title
Natural Resources – Recreational License Donation Program and Fund – Program Extension and Fund Name Change
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0155
Title
Recreational License Donation Program - Grants to Eligible Sponsor Organizations and Program Extension
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0361 /CH0260 (HB0349/CH0259)
Title
Natural Resources – Special Charter Boat License – Alteration
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0448 /CH0754 (HB0298/CH0017)
Title
Oysters - Tributary-Scale Sanctuaries - Protection and Restoration
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0505 /CH0518 (HB0703/CH0517)
Title
Environmental Violations - Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0546 /CH0760 (HB0904)
Title
Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Monitoring and Enforcement
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0744 (HB0532)
Title
Protecting Natural Resources and Preserving Productive Farms - Commission on the Development of a Blueprint for Solar Energy in Maryland
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0876 (HB1309)
Title
Aquaculture - Leases in Water Column - Riparian Right of First Refusal
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0054 Natural Resources - Lands Formed by Excavation Materials - Transfer of Authority Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2019 - 1:30 PM
HB0298 /CH0017 (SB0448/CH0754) Oysters - Tributary-Scale Sanctuaries - Protection and Restoration Delegate Busch 2 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/4/2019) - Chapter 17
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0349 /CH0259 (SB0361/CH0260) Natural Resources – Special Charter Boat License – Alteration Delegate Jacobs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 259
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0408 Natural Resources - Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays Trust Fund Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0532 (SB0744) Protecting Natural Resources and Preserving Productive Farms – Commission on the Development of a Blueprint for Solar Energy in Maryland Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0703 /CH0517 (SB0505/CH0518) Environmental Violations - Reporting Requirements Delegate Lafferty 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 517
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0904 (SB0546/CH0760) Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Monitoring and Enforcement Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1196 Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays Critical Area - Buffer Establishment and Buffer Management Plan - Exemption Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1309 (SB0876) Aquaculture - Leases in Water Column - Riparian Right of First Refusal Delegate Crosby 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0095 /CH0261 Natural Resources – Recreational License Donation Program and Fund – Program Extension and Fund Name Change Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 261
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0155 Recreational License Donation Program - Grants to Eligible Sponsor Organizations and Program Extension Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0361 /CH0260 (HB0349/CH0259) Natural Resources – Special Charter Boat License – Alteration Senator Hershey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 260
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0448 /CH0754 (HB0298/CH0017) Oysters - Tributary-Scale Sanctuaries - Protection and Restoration Senator Pinsky 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 754
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0505 /CH0518 (HB0703/CH0517) Environmental Violations - Reporting Requirements Senator Elfreth 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 518
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0546 /CH0760 (HB0904) Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Monitoring and Enforcement Senator Pinsky 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 760
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0744 (HB0532) Protecting Natural Resources and Preserving Productive Farms - Commission on the Development of a Blueprint for Solar Energy in Maryland Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0876 (HB1309) Aquaculture - Leases in Water Column - Riparian Right of First Refusal Senator Bailey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 10:00 a.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2019 - 10:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:20 PM