Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Codes -see also- Annotated Code of Md; Building Codes

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0469 (SB0018)
Title
Public Safety - Building Codes - Balcony Inspections (Jonathan's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1084 /CH0323 (SB0797/CH0322)
Title
Thermal Energy - Task Force and Regulations
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0018 (HB0469)
Title
Public Safety - Building Codes - Balcony Inspections (Jonathan's Law)
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0797 /CH0322 (HB1084/CH0323)
Title
Thermal Energy - Task Force and Regulations
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0469 (SB0018) Public Safety - Building Codes - Balcony Inspections (Jonathan's Law) Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1084 /CH0323 (SB0797/CH0322) Thermal Energy - Task Force and Regulations Delegate Stein 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 323
Economic Matters
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0018 (HB0469) Public Safety - Building Codes - Balcony Inspections (Jonathan's Law) Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Failed (21-25)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/29/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB0797 /CH0322 (HB1084/CH0323) Thermal Energy - Task Force and Regulations Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 322
Finance
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM