Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Codes -see also- Annotated Code of Md; Building Codes

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0565 /CH0514
Title
Criminal Law - Possession of Less Than 10 Grams of Marijuana - Code Violation
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0711 (SB0643)
Title
State Board of Plumbing - State Plumbing Code - Adoption of the International Plumbing and Fuel Gas Codes
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1429
Title
Recovery Home Residential Rights Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate Howard, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1471 (SB0831)
Title
State Board of Plumbing - State Plumbing Code - Adoption and Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Vaughn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0033 (HB0642/CH0110)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0643 (HB0711)
Title
State Board of Plumbing - State Plumbing Code - Adoption of the International Plumbing and Fuel Gas Codes
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0725 /CH0228
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Cross-References and Corrections
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0831 (HB1471)
Title
State Board of Plumbing - State Plumbing Code - Adoption and Enforcement
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0565 /CH0514 Criminal Law - Possession of Less Than 10 Grams of Marijuana - Code Violation Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 514
Judiciary
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0711 (SB0643) State Board of Plumbing - State Plumbing Code - Adoption of the International Plumbing and Fuel Gas Codes Delegate Barkley 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1429 Recovery Home Residential Rights Protection Act Delegate Howard, S. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1471 (SB0831) State Board of Plumbing - State Plumbing Code - Adoption and Enforcement Delegate Vaughn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0033 (HB0642/CH0110) Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses Senator Astle 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0643 (HB0711) State Board of Plumbing - State Plumbing Code - Adoption of the International Plumbing and Fuel Gas Codes Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0725 /CH0228 Alcoholic Beverages - Cross-References and Corrections President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 228
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0831 (HB1471) State Board of Plumbing - State Plumbing Code - Adoption and Enforcement Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM
Click to return on the top page