Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Codes -see also- Annotated Code of Md; Building Codes

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0043 (SB0090)
Title
Elections - Legislative and Congressional Redistricting and Apportionment - Commission and Process
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0058 (SB0112/CH0006)
Title
Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0700 /CH0123 (SB0590/CH0124)
Title
Washington County - Code of Public Local Laws - Legalization
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1087 (SB0871)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1186 (SB0465/CH0430)
Title
Nonpublic Schools - Fire Drill Requirements - State Fire Prevention Code
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1246 /CH0213
Title
Clean Cars Act of 2019
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0058 /CH0130
Title
Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation – Board of Trustees and Elimination of District Agreements
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0078
Title
Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicle Excise Tax Credit - Sunset - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0090 (HB0043)
Title
Elections - Legislative and Congressional Redistricting and Apportionment - Commission and Process
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0112 /CH0006 (HB0058)
Title
Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0465 /CH0430 (HB1186)
Title
Nonpublic Schools - Fire Drill Requirements - State Fire Prevention Code
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0590 /CH0124 (HB0700/CH0123)
Title
Washington County - Code of Public Local Laws - Legalization
Sponsor
Washington County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0871 (HB1087)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1030 /CH0771 (HB1413)
Title
The Blueprint for Maryland’s Future
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0043 (SB0090) Elections - Legislative and Congressional Redistricting and Apportionment - Commission and Process Speaker 3 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/04/2019 - 2:00 PM
HB0058 (SB0112/CH0006) Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions Speaker 6 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/25/2019 - 2:00 PM
HB0700 /CH0123 (SB0590/CH0124) Washington County - Code of Public Local Laws - Legalization Washington County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 123
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1087 (SB0871) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1186 (SB0465/CH0430) Nonpublic Schools - Fire Drill Requirements - State Fire Prevention Code Delegate Ebersole 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Ways and Means
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1246 /CH0213 Clean Cars Act of 2019 Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 213
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0058 /CH0130 Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation – Board of Trustees and Elimination of District Agreements Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 130
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/22/2019 - 4:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0078 Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicle Excise Tax Credit - Sunset - Repeal Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/30/2019 - 2:00 PM
SB0090 (HB0043) Elections - Legislative and Congressional Redistricting and Apportionment - Commission and Process President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0112 /CH0006 (HB0058) Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions President 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 6
Rules
2/13/2019 - 11:00 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/04/2019 - 2:00 PM
SB0465 /CH0430 (HB1186) Nonpublic Schools - Fire Drill Requirements - State Fire Prevention Code Senator King 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 430
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0590 /CH0124 (HB0700/CH0123) Washington County - Code of Public Local Laws - Legalization Washington County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 124
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0871 (HB1087) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB1030 /CH0771 (HB1413) The Blueprint for Maryland’s Future President 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 771
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/06/2019 - 4:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:20 PM