Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Collective Bargaining

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0318
Title
Labor and Employment - Labor Organizations - Right to Work
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0667 /CH0262 (SB0422/CH0261)
Title
Public School Employees - Collective Bargaining - Representation Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0790
Title
State Employees - Collective Bargaining - Judicial Branch Employees
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0863 (SB0841/CH0428)
Title
Higher Education Fair Share Act
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0893 (SB0759)
Title
State Personnel - Equality for Maryland Caregivers Act of 2013
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0895 /CH0648
Title
Education - Howard County Library System - Collective Bargaining Ho. Co. 3-13
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1052
Title
Education - Public Charter Schools - Hiring of Certificated and Paraprofessional Employees
Sponsor
Delegate Ivey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1280 (SB0677)
Title
Collective Bargaining - State Labor Relations Board and State Higher Education Labor Relations Board - Enforcement Authority
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0422 /CH0261 (HB0667/CH0262)
Title
Public School Employees - Collective Bargaining - Representation Fees
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0666
Title
Procurement - Required Clauses - Project Labor Agreement Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Kittleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0677 (HB1280)
Title
Collective Bargaining - State Labor Relations Board and State Higher Education Labor Relations Board - Enforcement Authority
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0759 (HB0893)
Title
State Personnel - Equality for Maryland Caregivers Act of 2013
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0841 /CH0428 (HB0863)
Title
Higher Education Fair Share Act
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0318 Labor and Employment - Labor Organizations - Right to Work Delegate Miller, W. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0667 /CH0262 (SB0422/CH0261) Public School Employees - Collective Bargaining - Representation Fees Delegate Hixson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 262
Ways and Means
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0790 State Employees - Collective Bargaining - Judicial Branch Employees Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
HB0863 (SB0841/CH0428) Higher Education Fair Share Act Speaker 3 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Appropriations
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0893 (SB0759) State Personnel - Equality for Maryland Caregivers Act of 2013 Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0895 /CH0648 Education - Howard County Library System - Collective Bargaining Ho. Co. 3-13 Howard County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 648
Ways and Means
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1052 Education - Public Charter Schools - Hiring of Certificated and Paraprofessional Employees Delegate Ivey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1280 (SB0677) Collective Bargaining - State Labor Relations Board and State Higher Education Labor Relations Board - Enforcement Authority Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0422 /CH0261 (HB0667/CH0262) Public School Employees - Collective Bargaining - Representation Fees Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 261
Finance
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/08/2013 - 11:30 AM
SB0666 Procurement - Required Clauses - Project Labor Agreement Prohibition Senator Kittleman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0677 (HB1280) Collective Bargaining - State Labor Relations Board and State Higher Education Labor Relations Board - Enforcement Authority Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0759 (HB0893) State Personnel - Equality for Maryland Caregivers Act of 2013 Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0841 /CH0428 (HB0863) Higher Education Fair Share Act President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 428
Finance
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM