Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Commercial Rehabilitation -see also- Urban Renewal

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0282
Title
Economic Development - One Maryland Tax Credit - Expansion
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0386 /CH0444
Title
Montgomery County - Economic Development - Business Improvement Districts MC 12-17
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0649 /CH0085 (SB0569/CH0084)
Title
Charles County - Property Tax Credit - Priority Funding Areas
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0695 /CH0096 (SB0930/CH0095)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Property Tax - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements - Economic Development Projects
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1052 (SB0873/CH0489)
Title
Economic Development - Job Creation Tax Credit - Alteration
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0569 /CH0084 (HB0649/CH0085)
Title
Charles County - Property Tax Credit - Priority Funding Areas
Sponsor
Charles County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0796
Title
Economic Development - County Economic Development Tax Incentives Program and One Maryland Tax Credit
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0873 /CH0489 (HB1052)
Title
Economic Development - Job Creation Tax Credit - Alteration
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0930 /CH0095 (HB0695/CH0096)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Property Tax - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements - Economic Development Projects
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Senators
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0282 Economic Development - One Maryland Tax Credit - Expansion Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0386 /CH0444 Montgomery County - Economic Development - Business Improvement Districts MC 12-17 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 444
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0649 /CH0085 (SB0569/CH0084) Charles County - Property Tax Credit - Priority Funding Areas Charles County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 85
Ways and Means
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0695 /CH0096 (SB0930/CH0095) Anne Arundel County - Property Tax - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements - Economic Development Projects Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 96
Ways and Means
2/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1052 (SB0873/CH0489) Economic Development - Job Creation Tax Credit - Alteration Delegate Walker 4 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0569 /CH0084 (HB0649/CH0085) Charles County - Property Tax Credit - Priority Funding Areas Charles County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 84
Budget and Taxation
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0796 Economic Development - County Economic Development Tax Incentives Program and One Maryland Tax Credit Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0873 /CH0489 (HB1052) Economic Development - Job Creation Tax Credit - Alteration Senator Madaleno 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 489
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0930 /CH0095 (HB0695/CH0096) Anne Arundel County - Property Tax - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements - Economic Development Projects Anne Arundel County Senators 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 95
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM