Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Commercial Rehabilitation -see also- Urban Renewal

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1028 (SB0919)
Title
Creation of a State Debt – Baltimore City – Port Discovery Children’s Museum
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1286 /CH0839 (SB0614/CH0840)
Title
State Center - Redevelopment - Requirements, Participation, and Process
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1454 /CH0842 (SB0967/CH0843)
Title
Heritage Structure Rehabilitation Tax Credit – Commercial Rehabilitations – Affordable Housing
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0469
Title
Public Health - School Buildings - Minimum Health Standards (Healthy Schools Program)
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0614 /CH0840 (HB1286/CH0839)
Title
State Center - Redevelopment - Requirements, Participation, and Process
Sponsor
Senator Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0918
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Federal Hill Streetscape Improvements
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0919 (HB1028)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Port Discovery Children's Museum
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0967 /CH0843 (HB1454/CH0842)
Title
Heritage Structure Rehabilitation Tax Credit - Commercial Rehabilitations - Affordable Housing
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1028 (SB0919) Creation of a State Debt – Baltimore City – Port Discovery Children’s Museum Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/12/2018 - 10:30 AM
HB1286 /CH0839 (SB0614/CH0840) State Center - Redevelopment - Requirements, Participation, and Process Delegate Glenn 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 839
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1454 /CH0842 (SB0967/CH0843) Heritage Structure Rehabilitation Tax Credit – Commercial Rehabilitations – Affordable Housing Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 842
Ways and Means
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0469 Public Health - School Buildings - Minimum Health Standards (Healthy Schools Program) Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0614 /CH0840 (HB1286/CH0839) State Center - Redevelopment - Requirements, Participation, and Process Senator Robinson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 840
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0918 Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Federal Hill Streetscape Improvements Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 9:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2018 - 9:00 AM
SB0919 (HB1028) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Port Discovery Children's Museum Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 9:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2018 - 9:00 AM
SB0967 /CH0843 (HB1454/CH0842) Heritage Structure Rehabilitation Tax Credit - Commercial Rehabilitations - Affordable Housing Senator Ferguson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 843
Budget and Taxation
3/14/2018 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM