Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Commercial Property

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0085
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Inspectors
Sponsor
Delegate Impallaria
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0414 /CH0199
Title
St. Mary’s County – Property Tax Credit for Improvements to Commercial Real Property and Transfer Tax Sunset Extension
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0561 (SB0315)
Title
Electric Industry - Community Choice Energy - Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0853
Title
Local Government - Clean Energy Loan Programs - Grid Resilience Projects
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0980 /CH0636 (SB0775)
Title
Income Tax - Energy Storage Tax Credit - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1252
Title
Property Tax - Appeals of Assessments - Commercial Real Property
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1276
Title
County Property Tax - Classifications of Real Property and Authority to Set Special Rates
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1472
Title
Baltimore City - Solar Panels on Commercial and Residential Structures - Prohibition on Limitation
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1490
Title
Environment - Building Energy Performance Standards and Greenhouse Gas Emissions Reduction Targets (Clean Buildings Jobs Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1508 (SB0790)
Title
Information Technology - Communications Lines - Installation
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1538
Title
Environment - Waste Haulers - Reporting Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0315 (HB0561)
Title
Electric Industry - Community Choice Energy
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0352 /CH0318
Title
Somerset County – Property Tax Exemption for Manufacturing Property – Eastern Shore Forest Products, Inc.
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0722
Title
Clean Energy Loan Program - Environmental Remediation and Resiliency Projects
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0775 (HB0980/CH0636)
Title
Income Tax – Energy Storage Tax Credit – Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1075
Title
Adult-Use Cannabis - Legalization
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0085 Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Inspectors Delegate Impallaria 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0414 /CH0199 St. Mary’s County – Property Tax Credit for Improvements to Commercial Real Property and Transfer Tax Sunset Extension St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 199
Ways and Means
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0561 (SB0315) Electric Industry - Community Choice Energy - Pilot Program Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Economic Matters
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0853 Local Government - Clean Energy Loan Programs - Grid Resilience Projects Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Economic Matters
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0980 /CH0636 (SB0775) Income Tax - Energy Storage Tax Credit - Alterations Delegate Reznik 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 636
Ways and Means
2/21/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1252 Property Tax - Appeals of Assessments - Commercial Real Property Delegate Solomon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1276 County Property Tax - Classifications of Real Property and Authority to Set Special Rates Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1472 Baltimore City - Solar Panels on Commercial and Residential Structures - Prohibition on Limitation Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2020 - 1:30 PM
HB1490 Environment - Building Energy Performance Standards and Greenhouse Gas Emissions Reduction Targets (Clean Buildings Jobs Act of 2020) Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB1508 (SB0790) Information Technology - Communications Lines - Installation Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/09/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1538 Environment - Waste Haulers - Reporting Requirement Delegate Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0315 (HB0561) Electric Industry - Community Choice Energy Senator Beidle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0352 /CH0318 Somerset County – Property Tax Exemption for Manufacturing Property – Eastern Shore Forest Products, Inc. Senator Carozza 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 318
Budget and Taxation
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0722 Clean Energy Loan Program - Environmental Remediation and Resiliency Projects Senator Hester 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0775 (HB0980/CH0636) Income Tax – Energy Storage Tax Credit – Alterations Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB1075 Adult-Use Cannabis - Legalization Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/14/2020 10:50 AM