Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Community Development

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0033
Title
Housing and Community Development - Community Development Projects and Public Purpose Projects
Sponsor
Delegate Vitale
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0182 /CH0075
Title
Housing - Community Development Administration - Residential Mortgage Loans
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0843 (SB0494)
Title
Housing and Community Development - Neighborhood and Community Assistance Program Tax Credit - Maximum Contributions
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0916
Title
Economic Development - Community Revitalization and Improvement Zones
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1098
Title
Public Housing Authorities - Property Transfers - Rights and Benefits of Tenants
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1178 /CH0301
Title
Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Exemption - Purchase Money Mortgage or Purchase Money Deed of Trust
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0058
Title
Housing and Community Development - Notice of Proposed Projects
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0494 (HB0843)
Title
Housing and Community Development - Neighborhood and Community Assistance Program Tax Credit - Maximum Contributions
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0033 Housing and Community Development - Community Development Projects and Public Purpose Projects Delegate Vitale 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0182 /CH0075 Housing - Community Development Administration - Residential Mortgage Loans Delegate Lafferty 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 75
Environment and Transportation
2/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0843 (SB0494) Housing and Community Development - Neighborhood and Community Assistance Program Tax Credit - Maximum Contributions Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0916 Economic Development - Community Revitalization and Improvement Zones Delegate Wilson, B. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1098 Public Housing Authorities - Property Transfers - Rights and Benefits of Tenants Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1178 /CH0301 Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Exemption - Purchase Money Mortgage or Purchase Money Deed of Trust Delegate Lafferty 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 301
Environment and Transportation
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0058 Housing and Community Development - Notice of Proposed Projects Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/03/2015 - 2:00 PM
SB0494 (HB0843) Housing and Community Development - Neighborhood and Community Assistance Program Tax Credit - Maximum Contributions Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM