Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Communications -see also- Language; Telecommun & Info Tech

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0308 (SB0338/CH0117)
Title
Public Safety - Statewide Interoperability Radio Control Board - Established
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1221
Title
Discovery - Disclosures Regarding Anonymous Internet Communications
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1492
Title
Communications Tax Reform Act of 2014
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0338 /CH0117 (HB0308)
Title
Public Safety - Statewide Interoperability Radio Control Board - Established
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0308 (SB0338/CH0117) Public Safety - Statewide Interoperability Radio Control Board - Established Speaker 3 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Finance
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1221 Discovery - Disclosures Regarding Anonymous Internet Communications Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1492 Communications Tax Reform Act of 2014 Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0338 /CH0117 (HB0308) Public Safety - Statewide Interoperability Radio Control Board - Established President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 117
Finance
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM