Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Commuters -see also- Car Pools

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1010
Title
Maryland Transit Administration Oversight and Planning Board
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1012 /CH0289
Title
Tax Credit - Commuter Benefits - Eligibility and Credit Amount
Sponsor
Delegate McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1338
Title
Transportation - Transit Improvements - Interstate 270 Corridor
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1439
Title
Chesapeake Bay Water Transportation Network
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1607 (SB1052/CH0025)
Title
University of Maryland Strategic Partnership Act of 2016
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0275 (HB0092)
Title
Railroad Company - Movement of Freight - Required Crew
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0655
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Qualified Maryland Toll Expenses
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1052 /CH0025 (HB1607)
Title
University of Maryland Strategic Partnership Act of 2016
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1010 Maryland Transit Administration Oversight and Planning Board Delegate Lierman 2 2 Vote on Veto Special Ordered until 1/31/2017
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1012 /CH0289 Tax Credit - Commuter Benefits - Eligibility and Credit Amount Delegate McCray 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 289
Ways and Means
3/02/2016 - 2:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2016 - 1:30 PM
HB1338 Transportation - Transit Improvements - Interstate 270 Corridor Delegate Smith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1439 Chesapeake Bay Water Transportation Network Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1607 (SB1052/CH0025) University of Maryland Strategic Partnership Act of 2016 Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0275 (HB0092) Railroad Company - Movement of Freight - Required Crew Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0655 Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Qualified Maryland Toll Expenses Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1052 /CH0025 (HB1607) University of Maryland Strategic Partnership Act of 2016 Senator Ferguson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 25
Budget and Taxation
3/01/2016 - 8:30 AM
Appropriations
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM