Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Condemnation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0082 /CH0681 (SB0125/CH0682)
Title
Woodrow Wilson Bridge and Tunnel Compact - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0606 (SB0178/CH0500)
Title
Horse Racing - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Eligibility and Capital Expenditures
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1308 (SB0969/CH0840)
Title
Electricity - Construction of Overhead Transmission Lines - Condemnation Authority
Sponsor
Delegate Branch
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0125 /CH0682 (HB0082/CH0681)
Title
Woodrow Wilson Bridge and Tunnel Compact - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0178 /CH0500 (HB0606)
Title
Horse Racing - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Eligibility and Capital Expenditures
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0969 /CH0840 (HB1308)
Title
Electricity - Construction of Overhead Transmission Lines - Condemnation Authority
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0082 /CH0681 (SB0125/CH0682) Woodrow Wilson Bridge and Tunnel Compact - Repeal Delegate Carr 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 681
Environment and Transportation
2/09/2017 - 1:15 PM
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0606 (SB0178/CH0500) Horse Racing - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Eligibility and Capital Expenditures Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Ways and Means
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1308 (SB0969/CH0840) Electricity - Construction of Overhead Transmission Lines - Condemnation Authority Delegate Branch 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Finance
Economic Matters
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0125 /CH0682 (HB0082/CH0681) Woodrow Wilson Bridge and Tunnel Compact - Repeal Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 682
Finance
2/01/2017 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0178 /CH0500 (HB0606) Horse Racing - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Eligibility and Capital Expenditures Senator Peters 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 500
Finance
2/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0969 /CH0840 (HB1308) Electricity - Construction of Overhead Transmission Lines - Condemnation Authority Senator Feldman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 840
Finance
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM