Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Congress, U.S.

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0233
Title
Elections - Study Commission on the Redistricting Process in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0236
Title
Election Law - Districting Plan Questions - Inclusion of Map
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0832 (SB0361)
Title
Congressional Districting Process
Sponsor
Delegate Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1199
Title
Citizens' Congressional Redistricting Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1269 (SB0240)
Title
Task Force to Study Redistricting in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Braveboy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0001
Title
Reform of the Federal Toxic Substances Control Act of 1976
Sponsor
Delegate Hubbard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0003
Title
Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking Functions
Sponsor
Delegate Braveboy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0240 (HB1269)
Title
Task Force to Study Redistricting in Maryland
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0361 (HB0832)
Title
Congressional Districting Process
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0002
Title
U.S. Constitution - Article V Amendments Convention - State Approval of Federal Debt Increases
Sponsor
Senator Brinkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0003
Title
Crisis in Waiting Periods for Veterans with Disabilities to Receive Services from the Federal Veterans Benefits Administration
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0004
Title
Support of the Efforts of the Nagorno-Karabakh Republic to Develop as a Free and Independent Nation
Sponsor
Senator Garagiola
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0233 Elections - Study Commission on the Redistricting Process in Maryland Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB0236 Election Law - Districting Plan Questions - Inclusion of Map Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB0832 (SB0361) Congressional Districting Process Delegate Norman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB1199 Citizens' Congressional Redistricting Commission Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB1269 (SB0240) Task Force to Study Redistricting in Maryland Delegate Braveboy 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2013 - 2:00 PM
HJ0001 Reform of the Federal Toxic Substances Control Act of 1976 Delegate Hubbard 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/04/2013 - 2:00 PM
HJ0003 Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking Functions Delegate Braveboy 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/04/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB0240 (HB1269) Task Force to Study Redistricting in Maryland Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0361 (HB0832) Congressional Districting Process Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
SJ0002 U.S. Constitution - Article V Amendments Convention - State Approval of Federal Debt Increases Senator Brinkley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
SJ0003 Crisis in Waiting Periods for Veterans with Disabilities to Receive Services from the Federal Veterans Benefits Administration Senator Peters 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SJ0004 Support of the Efforts of the Nagorno-Karabakh Republic to Develop as a Free and Independent Nation Senator Garagiola 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM
Click to return on the top page