Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Congress, U.S.

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0698
Title
Elections - Study Commission on the Redistricting Process in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0915 (SB0740)
Title
Election Law - General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Districting and Apportionment Commission
Sponsor
Delegate George
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0970
Title
General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Hogan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1176
Title
Maryland Constitution - Congressional Districts - Requirements as to Territory, Form, and Boundaries
Sponsor
Delegate Braveboy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1213
Title
Maryland Congressional Redistricting Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Mizeur
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1217
Title
Task Force to Study Redistricting in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Braveboy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1327 (SB0582)
Title
Election Law - Redistricting Ballot Questions - Map of Proposed Districts
Sponsor
Delegate George
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0002 (SJ0001/JR0003)
Title
Rescission of Maryland's Ratification of the Corwin Amendment to the United States Constitution
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0004
Title
United States Constitutional Convention - Legislative Districting and Apportionment
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0006 (SJ0004)
Title
Conowingo Dam - Sediment - Dredging
Sponsor
Delegate Schuh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0007 (SJ0006)
Title
United States Constitutional Convention - Democracy Amendment
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0008 (SJ0008)
Title
Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking Functions
Sponsor
Delegate Braveboy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0582 (HB1327)
Title
Election Law - Redistricting Ballot Questions - Map of Proposed Districts
Sponsor
Senator Stone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0740 (HB0915)
Title
Election Law - General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Districting and Apportionment Commission
Sponsor
Senator Kittleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0001 /JR0003 (HJ0002)
Title
Rescission of Maryland's Ratification of the Corwin Amendment to the United States Constitution
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0004 (HJ0006)
Title
Conowingo Dam - Sediment - Dredging
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0005
Title
Commemoration of the 60th Anniversary of the Addition of "Under God" to the Pledge of Allegiance
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0006 (HJ0007)
Title
United States Constitutional Convention - Democracy Amendment
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0008 (HJ0008)
Title
Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking Functions
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0698 Elections - Study Commission on the Redistricting Process in Maryland Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0915 (SB0740) Election Law - General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Districting and Apportionment Commission Delegate George 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0970 General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment Commission Delegate Hogan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1176 Maryland Constitution - Congressional Districts - Requirements as to Territory, Form, and Boundaries Delegate Braveboy 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1213 Maryland Congressional Redistricting Commission Delegate Mizeur 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1217 Task Force to Study Redistricting in Maryland Delegate Braveboy 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1327 (SB0582) Election Law - Redistricting Ballot Questions - Map of Proposed Districts Delegate George 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
HJ0002 (SJ0001/JR0003) Rescission of Maryland's Ratification of the Corwin Amendment to the United States Constitution Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/24/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HJ0004 United States Constitutional Convention - Legislative Districting and Apportionment Delegate Frick 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 PM
HJ0006 (SJ0004) Conowingo Dam - Sediment - Dredging Delegate Schuh 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/24/2014 - 1:00 PM
HJ0007 (SJ0006) United States Constitutional Convention - Democracy Amendment Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
HJ0008 (SJ0008) Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking Functions Delegate Braveboy 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0582 (HB1327) Election Law - Redistricting Ballot Questions - Map of Proposed Districts Senator Stone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0740 (HB0915) Election Law - General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Districting and Apportionment Commission Senator Kittleman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SJ0001 /JR0003 (HJ0002) Rescission of Maryland's Ratification of the Corwin Amendment to the United States Constitution Senator Frosh 2 2 Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 3
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/31/2014 - 3:00 PM
SJ0004 (HJ0006) Conowingo Dam - Sediment - Dredging Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 3:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/31/2014 - 3:00 PM
SJ0005 Commemoration of the 60th Anniversary of the Addition of "Under God" to the Pledge of Allegiance Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
SJ0006 (HJ0007) United States Constitutional Convention - Democracy Amendment Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SJ0008 (HJ0008) Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking Functions Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM