Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Congress, U.S.

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0267
Title
Legislative and Congressional Districting - Standards and Processes
Sponsor
Delegate Afzali
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0428
Title
Voters' Congressional Districting Panel - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Flanagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0595 (SB0529)
Title
Special Elections for United States Senate Vacancies Act
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0610
Title
Elections - Study Commission on the Redistricting Process in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0850 (SB0448)
Title
Congressional Districts - Standards and Process
Sponsor
Delegate Gutierrez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0906
Title
Legislative and Congressional Districting - Standards and Processes
Sponsor
Delegate Miele
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1064
Title
Election Law - Audits of Election Results
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0001
Title
Number and Terms of United States Supreme Court Justices
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0002 (SJ0002)
Title
United States Constitution - Democracy Amendment
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0099
Title
Congressional Districting Process
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0448 (HB0850)
Title
Congressional Districts - Standards and Process
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0529 (HB0595)
Title
Special Elections for United States Senate Vacancies Act
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0814
Title
Congressional Districting Process
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0001
Title
Susquehanna River Basin - Sediment and Nutrient Pollution (National Chesapeake Bay Preservation Act of 2015)
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0002 (HJ0002)
Title
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy Amendment
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0267 Legislative and Congressional Districting - Standards and Processes Delegate Afzali 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0428 Voters' Congressional Districting Panel - Establishment Delegate Flanagan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0595 (SB0529) Special Elections for United States Senate Vacancies Act Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0610 Elections - Study Commission on the Redistricting Process in Maryland Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0850 (SB0448) Congressional Districts - Standards and Process Delegate Gutierrez 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0906 Legislative and Congressional Districting - Standards and Processes Delegate Miele 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1064 Election Law - Audits of Election Results Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HJ0001 Number and Terms of United States Supreme Court Justices Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HJ0002 (SJ0002) United States Constitution - Democracy Amendment Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules
SB0099 Congressional Districting Process Senator Norman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0448 (HB0850) Congressional Districts - Standards and Process Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0529 (HB0595) Special Elections for United States Senate Vacancies Act Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0814 Congressional Districting Process Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
SJ0001 Susquehanna River Basin - Sediment and Nutrient Pollution (National Chesapeake Bay Preservation Act of 2015) Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 3:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/03/2015 - 2:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/30/2015 - 3:00 PM
SJ0002 (HJ0002) United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy Amendment Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
4/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM