Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Conservation -see also- Soil Conservation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0043 /CH0303
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Perpetual Conservation Easements
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0067 /CH0343
Title
Maryland Plumbing Act - Non-Water-Conserving Fixtures and Devices - Repeal of Criminal Penalties for Sale or Installation
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0198 /CH0293
Title
Inheritance Tax – Perpetual Conservation Easement – Farming Purposes – Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0396 (SB0354)
Title
Local Government - Agricultural Land Preservation Fee
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0609 /CH0089 (SB0360)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0620 /CH0294
Title
County Agricultural Land Preservation Programs - Recertification and Remittance of Unexpended Funds - Extensions
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0727 /CH0743
Title
State Designations - State Paleontology Collection and Research Center - Calvert Marine Museum
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0766 (SB0610)
Title
Forest Conservation – Technical Study and Programmatic Review
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0939
Title
Regional Carbon Cost Collection Initiative
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1120
Title
Land Use - Zoning - Agritourism Activities
Sponsor
Delegate Rey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1229 /CH0066
Title
Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation – Use of Land – Signs and Outdoor Advertising Displays
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1345
Title
Sewerage Systems - Residential Major Subdivisions in Tier III and Tier IV Areas
Sponsor
Delegate Rose
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1351 /CH0492
Title
Agriculture – Easements – Special Occasion Events
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1440
Title
Natural Resources - Hunter Safety Instructors - State Park Entrance Fee
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1736 (SB1140/CH0623)
Title
Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Lot Release
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0026
Title
State Agency Loan Program and Jane E. Lawton Conservation Loan Program - Merger
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0354 (HB0396)
Title
Local Government - Agricultural Land Preservation Fee
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0360 (HB0609/CH0089)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0610 (HB0766)
Title
Task Force on the Forest Conservation Act Offset Policy
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0997
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Perpetual Conservation Easements
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1140 /CH0623 (HB1736)
Title
Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation – Definition of Child
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1235
Title
Income Tax Credit - Preservation and Conservation Easements - Credit Transfer
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0043 /CH0303 Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Perpetual Conservation Easements Delegate Jackson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 303
Ways and Means
1/17/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0067 /CH0343 Maryland Plumbing Act - Non-Water-Conserving Fixtures and Devices - Repeal of Criminal Penalties for Sale or Installation Delegate Lewis, J. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 343
Economic Matters
1/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0198 /CH0293 Inheritance Tax – Perpetual Conservation Easement – Farming Purposes – Exemption Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 293
Ways and Means
1/31/2018 - 2:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0396 (SB0354) Local Government - Agricultural Land Preservation Fee Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0609 /CH0089 (SB0360) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds Carroll County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 89
Appropriations
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0620 /CH0294 County Agricultural Land Preservation Programs - Recertification and Remittance of Unexpended Funds - Extensions Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 294
Environment and Transportation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0727 /CH0743 State Designations - State Paleontology Collection and Research Center - Calvert Marine Museum Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 743
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0766 (SB0610) Forest Conservation – Technical Study and Programmatic Review Delegate Healey 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed (114-25)
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0939 Regional Carbon Cost Collection Initiative Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/05/2018 - 2:00 PM
HB1120 Land Use - Zoning - Agritourism Activities Delegate Rey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1229 /CH0066 Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation – Use of Land – Signs and Outdoor Advertising Displays Delegate Jacobs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 66
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1345 Sewerage Systems - Residential Major Subdivisions in Tier III and Tier IV Areas Delegate Rose 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1351 /CH0492 Agriculture – Easements – Special Occasion Events Delegate Krebs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 492
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1440 Natural Resources - Hunter Safety Instructors - State Park Entrance Fee Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1736 (SB1140/CH0623) Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Lot Release Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0026 State Agency Loan Program and Jane E. Lawton Conservation Loan Program - Merger Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Finance
1/11/2018 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
3/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0354 (HB0396) Local Government - Agricultural Land Preservation Fee Senator Middleton 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0360 (HB0609/CH0089) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds Carroll County Senators 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Budget and Taxation
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/20/2018 - 1:15 PM
SB0610 (HB0766) Task Force on the Forest Conservation Act Offset Policy Senator Young 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (103-36)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0997 Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Perpetual Conservation Easements Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Budget and Taxation
3/14/2018 - 2:00 PM
SB1140 /CH0623 (HB1736) Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation – Definition of Child Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 623
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1235 Income Tax Credit - Preservation and Conservation Easements - Credit Transfer Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/04/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM