Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Constitutional Amendments

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0017 (SB0518)
Title
Elective Franchise - Registration and Voting at Polling Places
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0030
Title
Gaming - Video Lottery Terminals - Repeal of Constitutional Amendment - Changes to Statutory Provisions
Sponsor
Delegate Smigiel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0059
Title
Dedicated State Funds Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0163 (SB0172)
Title
Circuit Court for Anne Arundel County - Judges Sitting as Orphans' Court
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0176
Title
Transportation Trust Fund Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0363
Title
Tax Increases - Majority Vote Required
Sponsor
Delegate Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0441
Title
Courts - Death Penalty Court
Sponsor
Delegate Impallaria
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0524 (SB0643)
Title
Transportation Trust Fund - Use of Funds
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0574
Title
Office of the Inspector General - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0731
Title
Capital Projects - Eliminating Individual Bond Bills
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0864
Title
Real Property - Eminent Domain - Limitations on Condemnation Authority
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1227
Title
General Assembly - Appointment to Vacancy in Office - Procedure
Sponsor
Delegate Braveboy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0172 (HB0163)
Title
Circuit Court for Anne Arundel County - Judges Sitting as Orphans' Court
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Senators
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0253
Title
Transportation Trust Fund - Dedicated Highway Funds
Sponsor
Senator Brinkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0295
Title
Circuit Court Judges - Election, Qualifications, and Term of Office
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0518 (HB0017)
Title
Elective Franchise - Registration and Voting at Polling Places
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0545
Title
Legislative Immunity - Prosecutions for Bribery
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0643 (HB0524)
Title
End the Gridlock
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0706
Title
Referendum Petitions
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0829 /CH0422
Title
Transportation Trust Fund - Use of Funds
Sponsor
Senator Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0017 (SB0518) Elective Franchise - Registration and Voting at Polling Places Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0030 Gaming - Video Lottery Terminals - Repeal of Constitutional Amendment - Changes to Statutory Provisions Delegate Smigiel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0059 Dedicated State Funds Protection Act Delegate McMillan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0163 (SB0172) Circuit Court for Anne Arundel County - Judges Sitting as Orphans' Court Anne Arundel County Delegation 6 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
1/30/2013 - 2:30 PM
HB0176 Transportation Trust Fund Protection Act Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB0363 Tax Increases - Majority Vote Required Delegate Hough 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB0441 Courts - Death Penalty Court Delegate Impallaria 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/14/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB0524 (SB0643) Transportation Trust Fund - Use of Funds Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
Rules
HB0574 Office of the Inspector General - Establishment Delegate Miller, W. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0731 Capital Projects - Eliminating Individual Bond Bills Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB0864 Real Property - Eminent Domain - Limitations on Condemnation Authority Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
HB1227 General Assembly - Appointment to Vacancy in Office - Procedure Delegate Braveboy 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB0172 (HB0163) Circuit Court for Anne Arundel County - Judges Sitting as Orphans' Court Anne Arundel County Senators 6 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0253 Transportation Trust Fund - Dedicated Highway Funds Senator Brinkley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0295 Circuit Court Judges - Election, Qualifications, and Term of Office Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0518 (HB0017) Elective Franchise - Registration and Voting at Polling Places Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0545 Legislative Immunity - Prosecutions for Bribery Senator Frosh 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0643 (HB0524) End the Gridlock Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB0706 Referendum Petitions Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0829 /CH0422 Transportation Trust Fund - Use of Funds Senator Miller 2 2 Assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 422
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 PM
Appropriations
Ways and Means
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM