Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Constitution, U.S.

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1016
Title
Cannabis Freedom Act
Sponsor
Delegate Dwyer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0002 (SJ0001/JR0003)
Title
Rescission of Maryland's Ratification of the Corwin Amendment to the United States Constitution
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0004
Title
United States Constitutional Convention - Legislative Districting and Apportionment
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0007 (SJ0006)
Title
United States Constitutional Convention - Democracy Amendment
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0001 /JR0003 (HJ0002)
Title
Rescission of Maryland's Ratification of the Corwin Amendment to the United States Constitution
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0006 (HJ0007)
Title
United States Constitutional Convention - Democracy Amendment
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1016 Cannabis Freedom Act Delegate Dwyer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
HJ0002 (SJ0001/JR0003) Rescission of Maryland's Ratification of the Corwin Amendment to the United States Constitution Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/24/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HJ0004 United States Constitutional Convention - Legislative Districting and Apportionment Delegate Frick 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 PM
HJ0007 (SJ0006) United States Constitutional Convention - Democracy Amendment Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
SJ0001 /JR0003 (HJ0002) Rescission of Maryland's Ratification of the Corwin Amendment to the United States Constitution Senator Frosh 2 2 Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 3
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/31/2014 - 3:00 PM
SJ0006 (HJ0007) United States Constitutional Convention - Democracy Amendment Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM