Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Consumer Price Index

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0308
Title
Taxpayer Protection Act - State Income Tax - Consumer Price Index Adjustments
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1204 (SB0683)
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Payment of Wages
Sponsor
Delegate Braveboy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1499 /CH0419 (SB1039)
Title
Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1515 /CH0429 (SB1054)
Title
Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0683 (HB1204)
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Payment of Wages
Sponsor
Senator Garagiola
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1039 (HB1499/CH0419)
Title
Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1054 (HB1515/CH0429)
Title
Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0308 Taxpayer Protection Act - State Income Tax - Consumer Price Index Adjustments Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1204 (SB0683) Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Payment of Wages Delegate Braveboy 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1499 /CH0419 (SB1039) Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013 Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 419
Ways and Means
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1515 /CH0429 (SB1054) Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013 Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 429
Ways and Means
3/15/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0683 (HB1204) Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Payment of Wages Senator Garagiola 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB1039 (HB1499/CH0419) Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013 President 6 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB1054 (HB1515/CH0429) Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013 President 3 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM