Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Consumer Price Index

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0054
Title
Motor Fuel Tax - Downward Adjustment - Decrease in Consumer Price Index
Sponsor
Delegate Vitale
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0187
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Payment of Wages
Sponsor
Delegate Braveboy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0295 /CH0262 (SB0331)
Title
Maryland Minimum Wage Act of 2014
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0557
Title
Taxpayer Protection Act - State Income Tax - Consumer Price Index Adjustments
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0761 /CH0422 (SB0874)
Title
Health Insurance - Specialty Drugs
Sponsor
Delegate Hammen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0331 (HB0295/CH0262)
Title
Maryland Minimum Wage Act of 2014
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0371
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Payment of Wages
Sponsor
Senator Currie
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0874 (HB0761/CH0422)
Title
Health Insurance - Specialty Drugs
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0054 Motor Fuel Tax - Downward Adjustment - Decrease in Consumer Price Index Delegate Vitale 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0187 Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Payment of Wages Delegate Braveboy 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0295 /CH0262 (SB0331) Maryland Minimum Wage Act of 2014 Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 262
Economic Matters
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0557 Taxpayer Protection Act - State Income Tax - Consumer Price Index Adjustments Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0761 /CH0422 (SB0874) Health Insurance - Specialty Drugs Delegate Hammen 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 422
Health and Government Operations
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0331 (HB0295/CH0262) Maryland Minimum Wage Act of 2014 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 12:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
2/17/2014 - 12:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0371 Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Payment of Wages Senator Currie 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 12:00 p.m.
Finance
2/17/2014 - 12:00 PM
SB0874 (HB0761/CH0422) Health Insurance - Specialty Drugs Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Finance
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM