Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Consumer Price Index

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0062 /CH0279
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Disability Retirement - Reemployment Earnings Limitation
Sponsor
Delegate McConkey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0580 (SB0476)
Title
Behavioral Health Community Providers - Keep the Door Open Act
Sponsor
Delegate Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0688 (SB0407)
Title
Homeowners' Property Tax Credit - Eligibility - Cost-of-Living Adjustment
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0911
Title
Motor Fuel Tax Rates - Consumer Price Index Adjustment - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Morgan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1020
Title
Taxpayer Protection Act - State Income Tax - Consumer Price Index Adjustments
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1329 /CH0571 (SB0967/CH0572)
Title
Heroin and Opioid Prevention Effort (HOPE) and Treatment Act of 2017
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1416 (SB0962)
Title
Labor and Employment - Payment of Minimum Wage Required (Fight for Fifteen)
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0273 /CH0692
Title
State Forest, State Park, and Wildlife Management Area Revenue Equity Program
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0407 (HB0688)
Title
Homeowners' Property Tax Credit - Eligibility - Cost-of-Living Adjustment
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0476 (HB0580)
Title
Behavioral Health Community Providers - Keep the Door Open Act
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0962 (HB1416)
Title
Labor and Employment - Payment of Minimum Wage Required (Fight for Fifteen)
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0967 /CH0572 (HB1329/CH0571)
Title
Heroin and Opioid Prevention Effort (HOPE) and Treatment Act of 2017
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1005
Title
Real Property - Mobile Home Parks - Rent Increases
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0062 /CH0279 State Retirement and Pension System - Disability Retirement - Reemployment Earnings Limitation Delegate McConkey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 279
Appropriations
1/31/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/16/2017 - 8:30 AM
HB0580 (SB0476) Behavioral Health Community Providers - Keep the Door Open Act Delegate Hayes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0688 (SB0407) Homeowners' Property Tax Credit - Eligibility - Cost-of-Living Adjustment Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0911 Motor Fuel Tax Rates - Consumer Price Index Adjustment - Repeal Delegate Morgan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1020 Taxpayer Protection Act - State Income Tax - Consumer Price Index Adjustments Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1329 /CH0571 (SB0967/CH0572) Heroin and Opioid Prevention Effort (HOPE) and Treatment Act of 2017 Delegate Bromwell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 571
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1416 (SB0962) Labor and Employment - Payment of Minimum Wage Required (Fight for Fifteen) Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0273 /CH0692 State Forest, State Park, and Wildlife Management Area Revenue Equity Program Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 692
Budget and Taxation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0407 (HB0688) Homeowners' Property Tax Credit - Eligibility - Cost-of-Living Adjustment Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0476 (HB0580) Behavioral Health Community Providers - Keep the Door Open Act Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0962 (HB1416) Labor and Employment - Payment of Minimum Wage Required (Fight for Fifteen) Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0967 /CH0572 (HB1329/CH0571) Heroin and Opioid Prevention Effort (HOPE) and Treatment Act of 2017 Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 572
Finance
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
4/06/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1005 Real Property - Mobile Home Parks - Rent Increases Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM