Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Consumer Price Index

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0664 (SB0543)
Title
Labor and Employment - Payment of the Minimum Wage Required (Fight for Fifteen)
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0946 /CH0508
Title
Long-Term Care Insurance - Contingent Benefit Upon Lapse
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0957
Title
Motor Fuel Tax Rates - Consumer Price Index Adjustment - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Rey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1061 (SB0775)
Title
Education - Salaries of Noncertificated Public School Employees - Minimum Living Salaries
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1183 (SB1076)
Title
Health Insurance - Access to and Coverage of Specialty Drugs - Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0187 /CH0010 (HB0161)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2018
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0235
Title
Labor and Employment - Minimum Wage - Indexing
Sponsor
Senator Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0368
Title
Labor and Employment - State Minimum Wage Rate - Increase
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0543 (HB0664)
Title
Labor and Employment - Payment of the Minimum Wage Required (Fight for Fifteen)
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0775 (HB1061)
Title
Education - Salaries of Noncertificated Public School Employees - Minimum Living Salaries
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1019
Title
Labor and Employment - State Minimum Wage Rate - Increase
Sponsor
Senator Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1076 (HB1183)
Title
Health Insurance - Access to and Coverage of Specialty Drugs - Definition
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0664 (SB0543) Labor and Employment - Payment of the Minimum Wage Required (Fight for Fifteen) Delegate Hettleman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0946 /CH0508 Long-Term Care Insurance - Contingent Benefit Upon Lapse Delegate Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 508
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/09/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0957 Motor Fuel Tax Rates - Consumer Price Index Adjustment - Repeal Delegate Rey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1061 (SB0775) Education - Salaries of Noncertificated Public School Employees - Minimum Living Salaries Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1183 (SB1076) Health Insurance - Access to and Coverage of Specialty Drugs - Definition Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
SB0187 /CH0010 (HB0161) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2018 President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 10
Budget and Taxation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0235 Labor and Employment - Minimum Wage - Indexing Senator Robinson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0368 Labor and Employment - State Minimum Wage Rate - Increase Senator McFadden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0543 (HB0664) Labor and Employment - Payment of the Minimum Wage Required (Fight for Fifteen) Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0775 (HB1061) Education - Salaries of Noncertificated Public School Employees - Minimum Living Salaries Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1019 Labor and Employment - State Minimum Wage Rate - Increase Senator Robinson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1076 (HB1183) Health Insurance - Access to and Coverage of Specialty Drugs - Definition Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM