Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Consumer Price Index

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0042 (SB0094/CH0005)
Title
State Government - Consumer Price Index - Revised Statutory References
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0129 /CH0004
Title
Mandated Appropriation - City of Annapolis - Services
Sponsor
Delegate Busch
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0166 /CH0010 (SB0280/CH0011)
Title
Labor and Employment – Payment of Wages – Minimum Wage (Fight for Fifteen)
Sponsor
Delegate Fennell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0351 (SB0235)
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Use of Credit History in Rating Policies
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0479 (SB0424)
Title
Education - Salaries of Noncertificated Public School Employees - Minimum Living Salaries
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0546
Title
Health Insurance - Access to and Coverage of Specialty Drugs - Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0689 (SB0517/CH0305)
Title
Public Utilities – Electricity and Natural Gas Suppliers – Information
Sponsor
Delegate Carey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0768 /CH0692 (SB0759)
Title
Health - Prescription Drug Affordability Board
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1082 (SB0645)
Title
Local Health Services Funding - Modifications
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1264 (SB0902)
Title
Public Health - Products Containing a Flame-Retardant Chemical - Prohibition on Import or Sale
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1323 (SB0784)
Title
Civil Actions - Health Care Malpractice Claims (Life Care Act 2019)
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1413 (SB1030/CH0771)
Title
The Blueprint for Maryland's Future
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0094 /CH0005 (HB0042)
Title
State Government - Consumer Price Index - Revised Statutory References
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0156 /CH0003
Title
Mandated Appropriation - City of Annapolis - Services
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0235 (HB0351)
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Use of Credit History in Rating Policies
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0280 /CH0011 (HB0166/CH0010)
Title
Labor and Employment – Payment of Wages – Minimum Wage (Fight for Fifteen)
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0424 (HB0479)
Title
Education - Salaries of Noncertificated Public School Employees - Minimum Living Salaries
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0517 /CH0305 (HB0689)
Title
Public Utilities – Electricity and Natural Gas Suppliers – Information
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0645 (HB1082)
Title
Local Health Services Funding - Modifications
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0759 (HB0768/CH0692)
Title
Health - Prescription Drug Affordability Board
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0784 (HB1323)
Title
Civil Actions - Health Care Malpractice Claims (Life Care Act 2019)
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0902 (HB1264)
Title
Public Health - Products Containing a Flame-Retardant Chemical - Prohibition on Import or Sale
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1030 /CH0771 (HB1413)
Title
The Blueprint for Maryland’s Future
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0042 (SB0094/CH0005) State Government - Consumer Price Index - Revised Statutory References Speaker 6 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/25/2019 - 2:00 PM
HB0129 /CH0004 Mandated Appropriation - City of Annapolis - Services Delegate Busch 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 4
Appropriations
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0166 /CH0010 (SB0280/CH0011) Labor and Employment – Payment of Wages – Minimum Wage (Fight for Fifteen) Delegate Fennell 2 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 10
Economic Matters
2/08/2019 - 12:30 PM
Finance
HB0351 (SB0235) Motor Vehicle Insurance - Use of Credit History in Rating Policies Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0479 (SB0424) Education - Salaries of Noncertificated Public School Employees - Minimum Living Salaries Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0546 Health Insurance - Access to and Coverage of Specialty Drugs - Definition Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0689 (SB0517/CH0305) Public Utilities – Electricity and Natural Gas Suppliers – Information Delegate Carey 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0768 /CH0692 (SB0759) Health - Prescription Drug Affordability Board Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 692
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1082 (SB0645) Local Health Services Funding - Modifications Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1264 (SB0902) Public Health - Products Containing a Flame-Retardant Chemical - Prohibition on Import or Sale Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2019 - 2:00 PM
HB1323 (SB0784) Civil Actions - Health Care Malpractice Claims (Life Care Act 2019) Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1413 (SB1030/CH0771) The Blueprint for Maryland's Future Speaker 6 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) and Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Ways and Means
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0094 /CH0005 (HB0042) State Government - Consumer Price Index - Revised Statutory References President 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 5
Budget and Taxation
1/30/2019 - 2:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/04/2019 - 2:00 PM
SB0156 /CH0003 Mandated Appropriation - City of Annapolis - Services Senator Elfreth 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 3
Budget and Taxation
2/05/2019 - 2:30 PM
Appropriations
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0235 (HB0351) Motor Vehicle Insurance - Use of Credit History in Rating Policies Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0280 /CH0011 (HB0166/CH0010) Labor and Employment – Payment of Wages – Minimum Wage (Fight for Fifteen) Senator McCray 2 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 11
Finance
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0424 (HB0479) Education - Salaries of Noncertificated Public School Employees - Minimum Living Salaries Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/01/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0517 /CH0305 (HB0689) Public Utilities – Electricity and Natural Gas Suppliers – Information Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 305
Finance
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0645 (HB1082) Local Health Services Funding - Modifications Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0759 (HB0768/CH0692) Health - Prescription Drug Affordability Board Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Finance
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0784 (HB1323) Civil Actions - Health Care Malpractice Claims (Life Care Act 2019) Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0902 (HB1264) Public Health - Products Containing a Flame-Retardant Chemical - Prohibition on Import or Sale Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB1030 /CH0771 (HB1413) The Blueprint for Maryland’s Future President 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 771
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/06/2019 - 4:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:20 PM